Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Thai Buddhist Trust of Christchurch
Wat Buddha Samakhee
CC45588
N/A
Registered

Registration details

19/10/2010
June 30

Address for service

359 Marshland Road
Marshland
Christchurch
8083

Charity's other details

03 386 1634
watbuddhasamakhee


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To facilitate the practice and study of Theravada Buddhism in New Zealand. To conduct religious instruction to Thai community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 29/11/2024 $162,912 $108,679 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 13/12/2023 $149,846 $61,578 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 14/12/2022 $162,167 $71,857 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 15/05/2022 $125,282 $82,198 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $117,463 $103,813 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 6/12/2019 $97,040 $98,989 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 27/11/2018 $225,198 $166,046 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 31/01/2018 $251,864 $211,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 2/01/2017 $286,356 $127,016 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 11/12/2015 $171,879 $177,908 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wantana Royds Trustee 27/10/2024
Phramaha Phat Khamshu Trustee 17/10/2019
Phra Khru Dhammathorn Sethakic Trustee 30/06/2017
Phramaha Manit Visetchat Trustee 30/06/2017
Phramaha Sayan Siphongsai Trustee 11/12/2015
Apinchalit Clark Trustee 20/10/2010
Monthisha Chirapatanakorn Trustee 20/10/2010
Theng Chor Teng Trustee 20/10/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Pakki Chanton Trustee 27/12/2021
Phra Soponthammwong Trustee 11/06/2019
Phramaha Manit Visetchai Trustee 31/01/2018
Phra Soponjhammawong Trustee 30/06/2017
Pira Khru Dhammathorn Sethakic Trustee 30/06/2017
Phrakhrusuthatsoonthorn Monk Trustee 10/12/2015
Robin Bickley Trustee 20/11/2010
Soy Mias Bor Trustee 20/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/01/2024 NOC015
1/11/2022 NOC012
11/12/2015 NOC003
22/10/2013 AR003
6/08/2012 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.