pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Community Transformation Trust
CC57936
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/03/2020
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
CT Trust 20/03/2020
Community Transformation Trust 11/11/2020

Address for service

2C Handley Avenue
Narrow Neck
Auckland
0624

Charity's other details

09 445 1296

Asia

Indonesia, Tajikistan


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The relief of poverty through identified effective initiatives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Social services

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

CT Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees. Our trust deed states that we must have a minimum of three Trustees. We currently have four Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2020 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 21/07/2022 $220,000 $0
30/09/2021 22/07/2021 $5,000 $0
30/09/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Simon Christopher Forrest Trustree 9/11/2020
David Jeffrey Allis Trustee 5/03/2020
David Graeme Beard Trustee 5/03/2020
Mark Raymond George Christensen Trustee 5/03/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/11/2020 NOC003
11/11/2020 NOC002
11/11/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents