Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland City Triathlon Club Incorporated
CC47275
9429042588023
Registered

Registration details

24/01/2012
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 99079
Newmarket
Auckland
1149

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/AkldCityTri


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To engage in, promote, sponsor, develop and encourage multisports which include any two or more disciplines of swimming, cycling and running. To foster competition and championships of any two or more of the disciplines referred to. To promote coaching, training and club house facilities for the benefit of the local community. To use the funds of the Club in such a manner as may be considered necessary or proper in carrying out the objects of the Club.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To promote coaching, training and club house facilities for the benefit of the local community)

Sport / recreation

General public

Children / young people, Sports orientated people - both young and old

Entity Structure

Not-for-profit organisation governed by its committee members. The management of the Club shall be undertaken by the Executive Committee, comprising of a President, a Vice Presidents, Secretary, Treasurer and up to five spokespersons.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 7/11/2023 $23,798 $27,313 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/12/2022 $27,345 $25,538 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 28/12/2021 $41,616 $37,272 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 11/01/2021 $37,222 $42,488 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 27/12/2019 $48,763 $34,309 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 24/12/2018 $36,541 $34,140 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2017 $25,930 $37,339 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 31/01/2017 $35,343 $23,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 9/11/2015 $35,026 $26,289 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 24/10/2014 $13,938 $12,770 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Vince Seto President 1/12/2023
Scott Taylor Committee Member 29/12/2021
Karen Russo Committee Member 6/06/2021
Viggo Burkhardt Committee Member 4/10/2020
Nicola Sproule Treasurer 27/10/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicholas Bone Treasurer 30/11/2023
Cara Hair Committee Member 30/09/2022
Katie Gormley Committee Member 30/09/2022
Megan Dalton Committee Member 30/09/2022
Patricia Carden Treasurer 31/12/2021
Alison Feeney Committee Member 4/10/2020
Tony Sangster President 4/10/2020
Francesca Stafford Vice President 20/08/2018
Tracey Livingstone President 20/08/2018
Sacha Cowlrick President 30/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/11/2016 NOC006
3/11/2016 NOC005
7/04/2015 NOC004
24/10/2014 NOC003
24/10/2014 NOC002
19/12/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.