pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


One Percent Collective Trust
One Percent Collective
CC45257
9429043194186
Registered

Registration details

7/09/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 354
Pipitea
Wellington
6140

Charity's other details

0211893885
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/onepercentcollective/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/OnePercentNZ
https://www.instagram.com/onepercentnz/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

One Percent Collective exists to inspire generosity and to simplify regular giving, so charities can spend more time working on impact and innovation and less time on fundraising. 

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

One Percent Collective is a registered charity In New Zealand with donee status.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

Charity has been give an extension for file for 2016 until 30 November 2016.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 27/09/2023 $816,430 $830,433
30/09/2022 2/10/2022 $738,952 $752,822
30/11/2021 28/11/2021 $675,426 $655,570
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $567,539 $566,725
30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $473,230 $460,864
31/10/2018 25/10/2018 $550,012 $540,888
30/09/2017 23/10/2017 $265,107 $268,673
30/09/2016 27/11/2016 $168,887 $169,676
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $133,954 $110,416
30/09/2014 20/09/2014 $28,939 $29,260

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Meyer Trustee 10/06/2019
Kate Tindall Lum Trustee 26/07/2017
John Robson Trustee 11/02/2015
Richard Hayes Trustee 6/04/2013
James Bushell Trustee 1/03/2012
Patrick John Shepherd Trustee 13/08/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sarah Martin Trustee 29/08/2018
Shelley Mansfield Trustee 17/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/06/2021 NOC019
5/08/2019 NOC016
26/06/2019 NOC015
2/10/2018 NOC013
1/08/2017 NOC011
8/06/2016 NOC009
13/02/2015 NOC008
19/09/2014 NOC007
15/08/2014 NOC006
12/04/2013 NOC004

Charity Documents