Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dunedin Choral Society Incorporated
City Choir Dunedin
CC29845
9429042647324
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
January 31

Address for service

PO Box 5464
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
44 York Place
Moray Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

http://www.facebook.com/codchoir
http://twitter.com/citychoirdn
http://www.youtube.com/user/CoDChoir


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission of Dunedin Choral Society Incorporated is to foster the enjoyment of choral music and present performances to a professional standard for the wider Dunedin Community. The objects of the Society are limited to and established exclusively for charitable purposes in New Zealand, and are: (a) to encourage the performance and enjoyment of choral music; (b) to present concerts and entertainments of whatever kinds to members of the Society and to the public generally and to fix and levy charges for admission to such concerts, entertainments or any other activity organized by the Society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Presents choral classical music concerts)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2025 31/07/2025 16/04/2025 $118,191 $115,375 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2024 31/07/2024 23/05/2024 $104,915 $100,584 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2023 31/07/2023 3/07/2023 $112,255 $100,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 27/05/2022 $101,369 $90,494 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 19/06/2021 $108,989 $107,973 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 25/06/2020 $147,476 $137,341 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 21/06/2019 $84,330 $82,560 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 13/07/2018 $136,216 $120,134 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 16/05/2017 $102,100 $137,328 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 10/07/2016 $103,825 $111,369 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anne Thomson Secretary 21/04/2025
Leta Labuschange committee member 30/01/2024
Alison Tait Membership Secretary 2/05/2023
Ralph Gordon Committee member 26/04/2022
Ruth Taylor Committee member 23/04/2021
Rosi Crane Treasurer 3/02/2014
David Christopher Burchell Musical Director 30/06/2008
Deborah Jane Dons President 1/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Warren Perry Tate President 15/04/2025
Graeme Hammond-Tooke secretary 2/09/2024
John Matthews Secretary 30/01/2024
Ben France-Hudson Committee member 12/12/2023
Annaloes de Groot committee member 2/05/2023
Jan Stevens Membership Secretary 2/05/2023
Leta Estelle Labuschagne Deputy Treasurer 12/12/2021
Nigel Tucker Production Manager 12/12/2021
Annette Winter Committee member 30/06/2020
Maria Lane committee member 30/06/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2025 NOC029
30/05/2024 NOC027
31/05/2022 NOC024
6/08/2021 NOC022
5/08/2020 NOC020
4/11/2017 NOC016
1/02/2017 NOC014
10/07/2016 NOC013
30/05/2015 NOC012
17/05/2014 NOC011
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.