Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sikh Sangat NZ Trust
Bhai Gurdas Ji Gurmat Vidyala
CC52665
9429043291816
Registered

Registration details

3/09/2015
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 76875
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
84 Lady Ruby Drive
East Tamaki
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details

02041130000


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides religious services / activities Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy. Provides education

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Bhai Gurdaas Ji Gurmat School (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 31/01/2025 9/03/2025 $730,063 $517,380 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 31/01/2024 23/01/2024 $520,975 $578,970 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 28/02/2023 8/03/2023 $785,801 $839,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 15/04/2022 19/04/2022 $1,869,800 $946,652 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/08/2021 $1,240,894 $733,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 22/09/2019 $1,846,187 $625,945 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 5/05/2019 $506,682 $164,569 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/10/2017 $411,932 $54,595 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/11/2016 $58,291 $264 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Harpal Singh Secretary 1/11/2023
Rajwinder Singh Treasurer 29/07/2022
Maninderjeet Singh Trustee 26/08/2021
Jagdeep Singh Trustee 6/08/2021
Pardeep Singh Trustee 6/08/2021
Rajpreet Singh Sidhu Trustee 6/08/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sukhpreet Singh Secretary 31/10/2023
Gurinderpal Singh Brar Founding Trustee 20/10/2022
Jaspal Singh Trustee 14/06/2022
Jaswinder Singh Aujla Trustee 14/06/2022
Avtar Singh Trustee 6/08/2021
Ranjit Singh Trustee 6/08/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/12/2023 NOC020
1/11/2023 NOC019
18/01/2023 NOC017
16/06/2022 NOC015
15/08/2021 NOC013
17/08/2020 NOC010
17/08/2020 NOC009
13/09/2017 NOC004
12/09/2017 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.