Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Vincent House Trust
CC24505
9429042899198
Registered

Registration details

18/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

19 No 3 Road
Te Puke
3119

Charity's other details

07 573 6483


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide residential and rehabilitation services to the Te Puke Community To provide emergency accommodation for people with disabilities To provide longer term semi-independent accomodation for people who require supportive care. To provide rehabilitational, occupational, recreational and social skills programmes with defined priorities and measurable outcomes. To operate the centre and programmes in an appropriate manner to ensure Christian principles are upheld.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, People with disabilities

General public

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The consolidated performance report for the "Group" are for the economic entity comprising VHT and its wholly owned subsidiary Vincent House Recovery Trust (VHRT). The Group offers community based health care services and support to people with disabilities. VHT owns and operates all the facilities, plant and equipment and leases specific facilities, plant and equipment to VHRT. The operating subsidiary VHRT is also a charitable trust registered on the 23 June 2015 under the Charities Act 2005

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Vincent House Recovery Trust CC52856

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/11/2023 $1,083,636 $1,149,433 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 1/11/2022 $1,500,832 $1,269,468 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $1,023,719 $924,716 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 18/09/2020 $2,818,886 $1,007,116 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $1,182,505 $1,111,159 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 6/09/2018 $1,124,134 $996,735 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 6/02/2018 $1,296,083 $1,340,332 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 7/09/2017 $1,429,271 $1,237,291 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $1,012,698 $1,005,131 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 16/10/2014 $1,171,222 $1,362,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 01 April 2021 to 30 June 2022

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pamela Maureen Martin Trustee 11/12/2019
George Albert Jeffery Trustee 13/02/2018
Roger Martin Le Blanc Smith Chairman 3/03/2015
Charles Huia Peni Trustee 29/10/2006
Keith Allan Wratt Trustee 27/11/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Angela Bernadette Leigh Trustee 24/07/2022
Zela Lyn Peni Trustee 31/12/2019
Ann Bennett Dowman Trustee 13/12/2017
James William Dowman Trustee 14/12/2016
Arthur Noel Chamberlain Trustee 12/07/2016
Graham Street Trustee 29/12/2015
Colin Olesen Trustee 13/05/2014
Ivan Tuck Board Member 1/08/2011
Malcolm Leslie Taylor Trustee 6/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/02/2024 NOC026
28/07/2022 NOC023
21/04/2022 NOC022
24/02/2022 NOC021
9/01/2020 NOC018
13/12/2019 NOC017
26/02/2018 NOC014
14/02/2018 NOC013
21/09/2017 NOC011
23/02/2017 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.