Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Tauranga Art Gallery Trust
Tauranga Art Gallery
CC38535
9429042943525
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13255
Tauranga Central
Tauranga
3141
8 Wharf Street
Tauranga 3110
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details

07 578 7933


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Tauranga Art Gallery is a not-for-profit organisation. The role of the gallery is to create, exceptional art experiences that engage, inspire, challenge and educate both residents of the WBOP & visitors to the region, by showcasing quality local, national and international works of art in a range of media. We also incorporate exhibitions into our education programme on-site, providing children with new experiences and increase their understanding of the world around them.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To provide a public art gallery for the benifit of residents of Tauranga and the western Bay of Plenty and visitors to the region.)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 19/12/2024 $1,984,443 $1,948,769 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 5/07/2024 $1,763,214 $1,951,313 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Processing $1,525,835 $1,492,417 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2022 6/10/2022 $1,292,988 $1,308,065 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/01/2021 $1,469,991 $1,397,576 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 3/12/2019 $1,539,874 $2,094,416 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 9/10/2018 $1,464,619 $1,511,228 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 9/10/2018 $1,443,211 $1,448,888 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $1,301,458 $1,510,856 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 2/12/2015 $1,317,452 $1,333,126 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Allannah Winiata-Kellu Trustee & Mana Whenua Representative 1/07/2024
Hanna Scott Trustee 1/05/2024
Rachel Scott Trustee 1/05/2023
Alan Withrington Trustee 1/05/2021
Francisca Monica Vogelzang Trustee 1/05/2021
Wayne Andrew Werder Trustee 1/05/2021
Rosemary Anne Protheroe Trustee - Chairperson 1/05/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sylvia Willison Trustee and Mana Whenua Representative 30/06/2024
Zara Stanhope Trustee 12/02/2024
Steven Brian Farrant Trustee 30/04/2023
Emma Frances Gardiner Trustee 1/12/2022
Grant Neagle Trustee 30/04/2021
Rebecca Graham Trustee - Deputy Chairperson 30/04/2021
Mark Wassung Trustee 5/11/2020
Judith Stanway Audit Chair 1/05/2020
Mary Stewart Trustee 1/05/2020
Peter Anderson Chair 1/05/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/03/2023 NOC025
1/09/2021 NOC023
5/05/2021 NOC022
4/05/2021 NOC021
15/01/2021 NOC020
3/07/2020 NOC018
10/10/2018 NOC016
10/10/2018 NOC015
18/01/2016 NOC011
26/08/2015 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.