pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Northland Emergency Services Trust
Northland Rescue Helicopter
CC10801
9429042788645
Registered

Registration details

8/08/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 8011
Kensington
Whangarei
145
43 Western Hills Drive
Kensington
Whangarei
112

Charity's other details

09 983 2259
09 437 2140


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a dedicated emergency rescue helicopter service for the people of Northland

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Emergency / disaster relief

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2019 2/12/2019 $8,313,031 $7,878,344
31/10/2018 29/10/2018 $6,850,595 $6,170,181
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $6,492,431 $5,864,749
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $6,276,603 $5,027,361
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $5,951,253 $5,826,425
30/09/2014 17/09/2014 $5,675,560 $5,511,247
30/09/2013 27/09/2013 $5,349,402 $5,323,188
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $4,887,614 $4,494,105
30/09/2011 29/09/2011 $5,031,225 $3,533,536
30/09/2010 21/10/2010 $4,454,066 $3,181,408

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brent Warren Eastwood Trustee 28/06/2019
Murray Broadbelt Trustee 5/07/2013
Timothy Guy Davidson Trustee 18/01/2012
David Keys Trustee 24/06/2008
Paul Bradford Ahlers Trustee 16/07/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tony Devanney Trustee 28/03/2018
John Walker Bain Trustee 31/03/2014
Russell Donald Le Prou Trustee 30/05/2013
Colin Murray Johnstone Trustee 13/08/2012
Michael Lyn Rusbatch Trustee 7/03/2012
Karen Lesley Roach Trustee 16/09/2011
George Peter Swanepoel Trustee 30/06/2011
Ian Murray Webster Trustee 30/06/2011
Thomas Frederick James Riddell Trustee 30/06/2011
David McDonald Starr Trustee 31/05/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/07/2019 NOC017
18/07/2018 NOC015
19/04/2018 NOC014
10/04/2014 NOC011
25/09/2013 AR007
19/07/2013 NOC005
1/10/2012 NOC003
28/09/2012 AR006
2/08/2011 NOC004
21/10/2010 AR004

Charity Documents