pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Canterbury Philharmonia Incorporated
CC20028
9429042606673
Registered

Registration details

7/11/2007
December 31

Address for service

41 Longmuir Street
Ilam
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details

03 357 9542


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To form an orchestra, and any other sub-grouping of musicians, who will gather together in a friendly and supportive environment, to foster musical appreciation and performance. To pronote, hold and conduct regular rehearsals, and in so doing foster public interest in music.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides a chance for adult amatuer musicians to play in an orchestra)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Both players and audience - we give young players a chance to perform concerts wit a full orchestra

Entity Structure

The management and control of the affairs of the Canterbury Philharmonia , including the control and investment of funds, is vested in a Committee. The Canterbury Philharmonia has the following Officers, and they comprise the Committee: Chairperson; Vice-Chairperson; Secretary; Treasurer; Librarian; and three General Committee Members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 23/08/2021 $14,823 $15,805
30/06/2020 23/08/2021 $27,432 $24,073
30/06/2019 13/01/2020 $23,387 $26,000
30/06/2018 8/07/2018 $28,695 $26,788
30/06/2017 8/07/2018 $22,704 $22,753
30/06/2016 18/04/2016 $20,340 $21,420
30/06/2015 11/03/2015 $22,716 $24,194
30/06/2014 9/04/2014 $16,261 $17,509
30/06/2013 24/03/2013 $21,389 $23,386
30/06/2012 16/04/2012 $15,366 $14,663

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Al Sands Committee Member 31/03/2018
Lucy Page-Dalton Secretary 31/03/2018
Robyn Bisset Committee Member 31/03/2018
Sally Botur Committee Member 31/03/2017
Sarah Helleur Committee Member 31/03/2017
Bridget Beck Treasurer 9/03/2015
Malcolm McCulloch Chairperson 10/03/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Arthur Mark Hodgkinson Conductor 31/03/2017
Averil Ella Cullen Librarian 31/03/2017
Brian Hodges Committee Member 31/03/2017
Garth Raglan Somerset Jeune Treasurer 31/03/2017
John Blunt Committee Member 31/03/2017
Tracey Morgan Committee Member 31/03/2017
Kaylene Anne Murdoch Secretary 8/03/2015
Sarah Katherine Helleur Committee Member 8/03/2015
Lynette Mary Murdoch Committee Member 10/03/2014
Marco Rijnberg 11/03/2013 10/03/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/01/2020 NOC013
18/03/2015 NOC010
9/04/2014 NOC009
12/03/2013 NOC005
16/04/2012 AR005
12/03/2010 NOC004
5/07/2009 AR002
23/04/2009 NOC003
7/04/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents