pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kelly McGarry Foundation
CC54980
9429043311484
Registered

Registration details

28/11/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 794
Queenstown
9348
10 Memorial Street
Queenstown 9300
Lower Shotover
Queenstown
9300

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote, foster and advance charitable purposes which may relate to: 1) the relief of poverty 2) the advancement of education; or 3) any other matter beneficial to the community for the primary purpose of building and maintaining mountain bike trails in New Zealand and encouraging New Zealanders to participate in Mountain Biking activities, as well as supporting talented New Zealanders to help them achieve their Mountain Biking goals in both New Zealand and abroad

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Sport / recreation

Health

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Kelly McGarry Foundation is a charitable trust governed by a Board of Trustees. The board shall consist of no less than three and no more than five trustees. The board currently consists of four trustees. The trust raises funds to distribute for its charitable purpose. The funds are raised from organising Mountain Biking events, donations from the public, and merchandise sales. The trust is based in Queenstown, however is undertaking projects across New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 17/02/2023 $1,124 $479
30/09/2020 18/11/2020 $7,794 $26,542
30/09/2019 16/10/2019 $10,228 $8,872
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $32,510 $5,351

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fraser William Gordon Trustee 4/07/2016
Matthew McGarry Trustee 4/07/2016
Samantha Claire Hitchcock Trustee 4/07/2016
Thomas Marshall Hey Trustee 4/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Daniel Edward Wypler Trustee 31/03/2021

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents