Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kimberley Trust
CC22366
9429042970309
Registered

Registration details

31/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 9531
Newmarket
Epsom
Auckland
1149
27 Marewa Road
Greenlane
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09-557 1112


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. Advancement of Religion 2. Relief of Poverty 3. Purposes Beneficial to the Community 4. Advancement of Education All things incidental to the charitable purposes described above.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services

Other charities

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups, Community

Entity Structure

Kimberley Trust is a trust constituted by a Trust Deed in 2009. The operation of the trust is undertaken by the trustees who engage a mix of Contractors, Volunteers and Staff.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 28/11/2024 $1,266,642 $1,280,012 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 31/08/2023 8/09/2023 $1,388,033 $1,259,553 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 18/08/2022 $10,557,211 $1,420,339 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 28/06/2021 $1,565,288 $1,265,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 25/01/2021 $1,566,700 $1,387,485 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 29/06/2019 $1,444,840 $1,259,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2018 $1,475,190 $1,365,711 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $2,094,455 $1,096,217 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $3,206,246 $2,541,784 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Stephen Cluley Trustee 1/11/2024
Ross Terence Calkin Trustee 26/07/2022
Todd James Calkin Trustee 18/03/2022
Gregory Wray Fleming Trustee 7/06/2016
Peter Herbert Thorp Trustee 6/07/2011
Adrian Paul Anslow Trustee 1/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jason Charles Mills Trustee 18/03/2022
Lance Howard Janes Trustee 10/10/2014
Ross Terence Calkin Trustee 31/03/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/11/2024 NOC020
25/07/2022 NOC017
29/04/2022 NOC016
6/08/2018 NOC012
9/09/2016 NOC009
3/12/2014 NOC008
21/06/2012 NOC005
18/05/2012 NOC004
11/10/2011 NOC003
27/08/2010 AR003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.