Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Community Hospice Trust
CC20590
9429042773948
Registered

Registration details

22/01/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 8002
Gardens
Dunedin
9041
293 North Road
North East Valley
Dunedin
9010

Charity's other details

(03)4736005
(03)4736015


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust provides care for people with terminal illness, in a manner of their choosing, enabling them to live their lives as fully as possible. The Trust works in partnership with its community, offering education, support, care to family, whanau, carers and health and social service professionals, through a patient's illness and following death. The Trust's approach to care: Te Whare Tapa Wha (the four cornerstones of health) Te Taha Hinengaro - mental wellbeing Te Taha Wairua - spiritual health Te Taha Tinana - physical health Te Taha Whanau - family wellbeing

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Accommodation / housing, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Older people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Gordon Allen Foundation Trust CC31561

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/08 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/09.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 17/12/2024 $11,340,050 $9,991,866 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/12/2023 $9,517,250 $8,835,855 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 19/12/2022 $8,977,710 $8,063,315 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 2/12/2021 $8,980,295 $7,226,870 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/12/2020 $7,812,946 $6,805,522 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $8,126,489 $6,728,038 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $6,706,040 $6,668,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 8/02/2019 8/02/2019 $6,410,804 $6,295,822 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $5,823,969 $5,915,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 17/12/2015 $5,333,333 $5,304,815 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Megan Vintiner Employee - Director of Finance and Support 5/10/2023
Virginia Leigh Green Employee - Chief Executive Officer 5/10/2023
Donna Christine Matahaere-Atariki Trustee 31/08/2021
Wendi Helen Raumati Trustee 31/08/2021
Natalia Panayota Zambazos Dowrick Trustee 8/12/2020
Ross Leslie Parry Trustee 27/10/2020
Merrin Bath Trustee and Vice Chairperson 28/10/2014
Murray Tilyard Trustee 23/01/2008
Peter McIntyre Trustee 23/01/2008
Rachel Kathleen Brazil Trustee 23/01/2008
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jenny Guthrie Trustee 6/12/2023
Tony McKewen Trustee and Deputy Chairperson 25/10/2022
Jack Adam Gordge Trustee 30/08/2021
Patricia Gaye Robertson Trustee 14/11/2019
Marama Dale Preddy Trustee 26/08/2019
Stuart Heal Trustee 2/02/2016
James Malcolm Macpherson Trustee 21/02/2012
Martin Ferguson Trustee/Board Member 1/10/2010
David Perez Trustee 1/11/2009
Douglas Hay Board Member 1/11/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/10/2024 NOC025
15/01/2024 NOC024
11/12/2023 NOC020
26/11/2021 NOC016
25/11/2019 NOC013
29/02/2016 NOC009
18/12/2014 NOC008
18/01/2013 NOC003
18/12/2012 AR005
21/08/2012 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.