Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Omahu 2R Maori Reservation
Omahu Marae
CC45734
N/A
Registered

Registration details

18/11/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 2517
Hastings
4156
1857 Korokipo Road
RD 5
Napier
4175

Charity's other details

06 879 6890


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Omahu Marae Trustees being the legal entity shall effectively and efficiently govern and administer Omahu Marae in consultation with Hapū members of Ngāti Hinemanu and Ngai Te Upokoiri who together and all their descendants shall be recognised as the uri of Omahu Marae.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Marae on reservation land

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Omahu Trust Deed states there shall be a maximum of nine trustees and a minimum of six. The Omahu Trustees include three executive positions , Chairperson, .Secretary , and Treasurer The Trustees may lead sub committees as determined by Hapu (Beneficiaries) for needs and Annual Projects Authorised signatories - Two of Three ratified by the Omahu Marae Trustees to have the authority to sign the cheque book or authorise payments and any other legal documents

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 24/09/2024 $58,821 $146,779 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/10/2022 6/08/2024 $67,049 $219,795 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 3/08/2021 $53,495 $136,568 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 4/10/2020 $149,181 $173,333 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 15/10/2019 $1,088,037 $69,062 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 29/10/2018 $257,676 $53,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 11/10/2017 $203,286 $61,968 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 10/03/2017 $67,286 $62,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ngahiriwa Valene Bernadette Tai Tin Trustee 19/10/2023
Matena Tiara Hipera Te Moana Trustee 15/07/2020
Delia Ropiha Deputy Chairperson / Trustee 4/02/2018
Patricia Nuku Treasurer / Communications / Trustee 4/02/2018
Meihana Watson Chairperson 7/03/2011
Taranaki Stuart Ken Apatu Trustee 6/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Matthews Trustee 19/10/2023
Jonna Maree Rameka Co-opted Secretary 19/10/2023
Kui Tomoana Trustee/ Teasurer 19/10/2023
Ruka Rulon Paul Waapu Trustee 19/10/2023
Tamanuhiri Russell Trustee 19/10/2023
Hariata Nuku Trustee 4/02/2018
Monique Heke Trustee 4/02/2018
Narina Tumarae Trustee 4/02/2018
Patrick Le Geyt Trustee 4/02/2018
Sheryle Allen Secretary 4/02/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/05/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.