pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Momentum Waikato Community Foundation
Momentum Waikato
CC49535
9429043246984
Registered

Registration details

31/05/2013
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Momentum Foundation 31/05/2013
Momentum Waikato Community Foundation 2/09/2015

Address for service

PO Box 9283
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
127 Alexandra Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 834 0404
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/MomentumWaikato/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/MomentumWaikato
https://www.instagram.com/momentumwaikato/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support both financial and otherwise, for Community Organisations and for any Charitable Purposes; To promote and encourage generosity among the people of New Zealand towards Community Organisations and any Charitable Purpose; To establish and administer separate named funds within the Trust Fund in order to fulfil the wishes of individual donors who wish to support Community Organisations and any Charitable Purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Community development

Fund-raising

Other charities

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Entity Structure

The Foundation is administered by a Trust Board made up of 8 Trustees appointed by an Appointments Panel. At the first meeting of the Trust Board each year a chairperson, deputy chairperson, secretary and treasurer are elected. Investment and Distribution Committees are also in place to assist in managing the Foundation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 2/12/2021 $3,016,911 $3,818,228
31/03/2021 30/03/2021 $16,935,094 $4,690,061
31/12/2019 1/03/2021 $8,086,219 $8,557,425
31/12/2018 14/11/2018 $3,091,132 $805,110
31/12/2017 1/12/2017 $1,327,406 $1,811,671
31/12/2016 11/12/2016 $2,006,585 $501,809
31/12/2015 30/03/2016 $2,027,162 $314,890
31/12/2014 11/08/2015 $398,301 $178,176

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Maxine Moana Tuwhangai Trustee 15/09/2021
Alan David Livingston Trustee 15/04/2020
Joan Boyce Forret Trustee 20/03/2019
Holly Louise Snape Trustee 20/02/2019
Simon James Rickman Trustee 7/06/2017
Pamela Suzanna Roa Trustee 1/09/2015
Neil Andrew Richardson Trustee 16/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kenneth James Stephens Trustee 15/12/2021
Rachel Fuatino Karalus Trustee 16/12/2020
Leonard Gardner Trustee 19/02/2020
Parekawhia McLean Trustee 17/04/2019
Jonathan Harold Tanner Trustee 30/10/2018
Kenneth Williamson Trustee 30/10/2018
Annabel Cotton Trustee 5/04/2017
Niwa Nuri Trustee 5/04/2017
Matthew Cooper Trustee 3/09/2014
Cherry Taylor Trustee 19/08/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/12/2021 NOC030
21/12/2021 NOC029
15/12/2021 NOC028
12/01/2021 NOC024
9/04/2020 NOC023
4/03/2020 NOC021
17/04/2019 NOC019
16/04/2019 NOC018
2/06/2017 NOC014
28/04/2017 NOC013

Charity Documents