pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christian World Service
CWS
CC22288
9429043108978
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 22652
Christchurch
8140
309 Durham Street North
15 Halkett Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 3669274
03 3652919

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga

Africa

South Sudan, Uganda, Zimbabwe

North America

Haiti, Nicaragua

Asia

Afghanistan, Bangladesh, East Timor, India, Iraq, Israel, Jordan, Lebanon, Philippines, Sri Lanka

Europe

Ukraine


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Christian World Service (CWS) is the development, justice and aid agency of partner Churches in Aotearoa New Zealand. The Partner Churches are Anglican Church in Aotearoa New Zealand and Polynesia, Methodist Church of New Zealand, Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand, Religious Society of Friends and Christian Churches New Zealand. We work to end poverty and injustice throughout the world by supporting communities working for better lives and livelihoods, providing humanitarian relief in times of disaster, and campaigning against the causes of global poverty. We respond to people's need regardless of race, religious beliefs, gender, age, disability and sexual orientation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Poor Communities), Children / young people, Other charities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

"The business and operations of CWS are governed by the CWS Board, in accordance with the constitution, maintaining an overview of the organisation. The Board is responsible for approving all policies along with the strategic and annual plans, annual accounts and for employing staff. (Note apart from the National Director, the employment of staff has been delegated to the National Director). The Board consists of up to five persons nominated from the partner churches, one person nominated by the

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 9/12/2022 $1,912,056 $1,949,110
31/12/2021 18/01/2022 $1,513,339 $1,551,467
31/12/2020 2/12/2020 $1,366,430 $1,543,281
31/12/2019 20/11/2019 $1,320,046 $1,692,720
31/12/2018 28/11/2018 $2,151,237 $1,834,688
31/12/2017 6/12/2017 $1,666,458 $1,708,110
31/12/2016 16/11/2016 $1,939,464 $1,862,225
31/12/2015 5/11/2015 $1,747,911 $1,632,201
31/12/2014 12/12/2014 $1,783,389 $1,613,268

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tim Pratt National Director 28/08/2023
Michael Wallace Board Member 13/04/2023
Murray Overton Ex officio 23/08/2021
Stephen (Steve) Lee Board Member 31/10/2020
Georgina Kingsley Smith Board Member 20/08/2020
Kate Boardman Board members 23/05/2020
Fe'iloakitau Tevi Board Member 22/02/2020
Jonathan Florence Fletcher Board member 16/03/2019
Tara Tautari Board Member 1/07/2017
Sally Russell Board Member 30/11/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Bergin Board Member 4/03/2023
Edmond Fehoko Board member 24/02/2022
Pauline Florence McKay National Director 30/07/2021
Ian Lothian Board Member 31/10/2020
Jenny Smith Board Member 31/10/2020
Claire Hart Chair Board Member 23/11/2019
David Fielding Board Member 19/03/2019
Jenny Dawson Board Member 1/12/2018
David Culverhouse Board Member 23/11/2018
Graham French Board Member 14/08/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/11/2023 NOC035
27/11/2023 NOC032
31/03/2022 NOC030
23/11/2021 NOC028
25/06/2021 NOC027
12/10/2020 NOC025
9/10/2020 NOC024
24/09/2019 NOC022
7/02/2019 NOC021
20/02/2014 NOC017

Charity Documents