Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christian World Service
CWS
CC22288
9429043108978
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 22652
Christchurch
8140
309 Durham Street North
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 3669274
03 3652919

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga

Africa

South Sudan, Uganda, Zimbabwe

North America

Haiti, Nicaragua

Asia

Afghanistan, Bangladesh, East Timor, India, Iraq, Israel, Jordan, Lebanon, Philippines, Sri Lanka

Europe

Ukraine


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Christian World Service (CWS) is the development, justice and aid agency of partner Churches in Aotearoa New Zealand. The Partner Churches are Anglican Church in Aotearoa New Zealand and Polynesia, Methodist Church of New Zealand, Presbyterian Church of Aotearoa New Zealand, Religious Society of Friends and Christian Churches New Zealand. We work to end poverty and injustice throughout the world by supporting communities working for better lives and livelihoods, providing humanitarian relief in times of disaster, and campaigning against the causes of global poverty. We respond to people's need regardless of race, religious beliefs, gender, age, disability and sexual orientation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Poor Communities), Children / young people, Other charities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

"The business and operations of CWS are governed by the CWS Board, in accordance with the constitution, maintaining an overview of the organisation. The Board is responsible for approving all policies along with the strategic and annual plans, annual accounts and for employing staff. (Note apart from the National Director, the employment of staff has been delegated to the National Director). The Board consists of up to five persons nominated from the partner churches, one person nominated by the

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/12/2023 $1,910,517 $2,199,135 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 9/12/2022 $1,912,056 $1,949,110 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 18/01/2022 $1,513,339 $1,551,467 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 2/12/2020 $1,366,430 $1,543,281 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/11/2019 $1,320,046 $1,692,720 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/11/2018 $2,151,237 $1,834,688 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 6/12/2017 $1,666,458 $1,708,110 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 16/11/2016 $1,939,464 $1,862,225 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 5/11/2015 $1,747,911 $1,632,201 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 12/12/2014 $1,783,389 $1,613,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Wallace Board Member 13/04/2023
Stephen (Steve) Lee Board Member 31/10/2020
Georgina Kingsley Smith Board Member 20/08/2020
Kate Boardman Board members 23/05/2020
Fe'iloakitau Tevi Board Member 22/02/2020
Jonathan Florence Fletcher Board member 16/03/2019
Tara Tautari Board Member 1/07/2017
Jillian Ruth Hawkey Chairperson 8/09/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tim Pratt National Director 31/12/2023
Sally Russell Board Member 4/11/2023
Murray Overton Ex officio 4/08/2023
John Bergin Board Member 4/03/2023
Edmond Fehoko Board member 24/02/2022
Pauline Florence McKay National Director 30/07/2021
Ian Lothian Board Member 31/10/2020
Jenny Smith Board Member 31/10/2020
Claire Hart Chair Board Member 23/11/2019
David Fielding Board Member 19/03/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/01/2024 NOC039
22/12/2023 NOC037
27/11/2023 NOC035
27/11/2023 NOC032
31/03/2022 NOC030
23/11/2021 NOC028
25/06/2021 NOC027
12/10/2020 NOC025
9/10/2020 NOC024
24/09/2019 NOC022
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.