pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

NPH New Zealand Charitable Trust Board
NPH New Zealand
CC48254
9429043304462
Deregistered
30/06/2023

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of NPH New Zealand Charitable Trust Board at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

31/07/2012
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/06/2023 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 31/07/2012

Address for service

PO Box 9405
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
Level 3, 159 Hurstmere Road
Takapuna
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

02108628788
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/nphnewzealand

South America

Bolivia, Peru

North America

Dominican Republic, El Salvador, Guatemala, Haiti, Honduras, Mexico, Nicaragua


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of this charitable trust is to: - Provide financial and other support to vulnerable children, families and communities who live in conditions of extreme poverty; - Raise funds for programmes and facilities which help vulnerable children, families and communities who live in conditions of extreme poverty; - Educate New Zealanders on the issues of poverty and children's rights and provide meaningful and appropriate volunteer and visitor opportunities for New Zealanders who support NPH.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

NPH New Zealand Trustees are a small group of very active, dedicated people who have ample knowledge and experience in their respective fields. The Director manages the fundraising programme and the volunteers. NPH New Zealand is made up of 62 part-time volunteers who help with fundraising events and administration.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 29/06/2023 $435,004 $434,751
30/09/2022 11/09/2022 $466,590 $465,104
30/09/2021 15/09/2021 $330,501 $329,619
30/09/2020 31/08/2020 $325,811 $361,974
30/09/2019 20/09/2019 $281,137 $284,898
30/09/2018 16/09/2018 $268,528 $275,056
30/09/2017 15/11/2017 $216,637 $140,092
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $98,894 $124,801
30/09/2015 13/12/2015 $180,999 $138,883
30/09/2014 26/08/2014 $109,688 $38,229

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Gabriel Treasurer 22/04/2021
Adrianne Walker Trustee 29/03/2016
Miguel Angel Venegas Lopez Trustee 21/06/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tattianna Picoaga Trustee 24/04/2023
Lisa Marie Richan Trustee 21/04/2023
Kristina Letetia Frances Cavit Trustee 1/07/2017
Brian Richard FitzGerald Trustee 1/01/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/05/2023 NOC016
25/05/2022 NOC014
3/05/2022 NOC013
15/03/2022 NOC012
11/05/2021 NOC010
5/07/2017 NOC005
22/03/2016 NOC003
1/10/2014 NOC002
29/09/2013 AR001

Charity Documents