pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Parkour Association Incorporated
Parkour NZ - Tauhōkai Aotearoa
CC49781
9429043225101
Registered

Registration details

4/10/2013
October 31

Address for service

225 Tramway Road
Enderley
Hamilton
3214

Charity's other details

0277478426
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/ParkourNZ/
Twitter icon image
https://www.twitter.com/nzparkour


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Mission 1. Nurture the physical, social, mental/emotional, and spiritual wellbeing of individuals and communities through the practice of parkour. 2. Actively grow and support the development and recognition of parkour within Aotearoa New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Health, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Parkour NZ is governed by a Board of up to 9 members. Elected Members are elected by the members at the AGM, co-opted members are appointed by the Board. The Board decides on its own Officers (Chair, Secretary, Treasurer, etc.) and these positions can be held by one or more than one person. The Board hires (this position can be voluntary) a CEO to oversee the management of the organisation. They have volunteers and paid staff who support the operational delivery.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/04/2022 1/05/2022 $21,488 $23,291
30/04/2021 29/04/2021 $39,408 $36,827
30/04/2020 13/05/2020 $44,314 $32,967
30/04/2019 20/06/2019 $23,125 $35,418
30/04/2018 29/11/2017 $38,342 $24,274
30/04/2017 10/03/2017 $24,174 $29,044
30/04/2016 23/05/2016 $29,712 $22,387
30/04/2015 21/05/2015 $8,276 $2,580
30/04/2014 24/03/2014 $45 $1,320

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Louis Gower Board Member 15/02/2022
Martini Miller-Pānapa Board Member 5/02/2022
Tim Dorrian Board Member 6/02/2021
Emma Nitayawan Board Member 16/07/2020
Spencer Barley Board Member 13/05/2020
Phil Hyde Board Member 11/06/2019
Michelle Kan Board Member 4/02/2018
Nigel Elvidge Chair 5/02/2017
Damien Lawrence Puddle CEO 27/01/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Maika Hemera Board Member 5/02/2022
Nicole Puddle Secretary/Treasurer 5/02/2022
Tim Rogers Board Member 6/02/2021
Terri Willcocks Board Member 8/02/2020
Dane Grant Board Member 4/02/2017
Martini Miller Regional Rep 4/02/2017
Aren Olsen Board Member 26/03/2016
Leanne Jenkins Board Member 26/03/2016
Pearlmill Johnny Chow Board Member 26/03/2016
Terence Turner Board Member 31/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/01/2022 NOC016
5/10/2018 NOC012
30/08/2017 NOC010
29/08/2017 NOC009
15/03/2017 NOC008
11/03/2017 NOC007
23/03/2016 NOC004
23/08/2014 NOC003
4/02/2014 NOC002
10/10/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents