Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Invercargill Garrison Band Incorporated
Ascot Park Hotel Brass of Invercargill
CC39723
9429042647812
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

136 Nelson Street
Georgetown
Invercargill
9812
249 Spey Street
Invercargill
9810

Charity's other details

Ascot Park Hotel Brass


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Advance Brass Music, attend and compete in regional and national competitions and contribute to community events.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To Advance Brass Music), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 31/03/2024 29/02/2024 $19,654 $60,052 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2022 31/03/2023 27/02/2023 $58,550 $37,964 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2021 31/03/2022 17/05/2022 $47,884 $40,845 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2020 31/07/2021 2/08/2021 $15,136 $25,205 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2019 31/03/2020 18/08/2020 $70,774 $78,505 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2018 31/03/2019 12/07/2019 $87,688 $74,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2017 31/03/2018 21/05/2018 $101,775 $81,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2016 31/03/2017 17/05/2017 $162,628 $160,350 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2016 $76,081 $95,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2015 $109,170 $89,596 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John McKinlay President 27/03/2025
Linda McGregor Secretary 27/03/2025
Gemma Ellis Treasurer 4/06/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Beverly Ann Chesney Secretary 27/03/2025
Grant Yorkstone President 22/02/2024
Patricia Ann Gooding Committee Member 22/02/2024
Simon Ward Treasurer 30/04/2022
Kerri Hellyer Secretary 31/07/2020
Shaun Chalmers President 31/07/2020
Graham Dick President 24/03/2018
Pat Service Secretary 24/03/2018
Lynne Kennington Committee Member 30/09/2016
Grant Yorkstone President 1/01/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/03/2025 NOC021
3/06/2024 NOC020
28/09/2020 NOC011
31/03/2016 NOC006
13/01/2013 AR005
15/09/2012 NOC001
22/04/2012 AR004
19/01/2011 AR003
30/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.