pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kuaotunu Hall Committee
CC48231
9429046943453
Registered

Registration details

11/09/2012
June 30

Address for service

1094 Te Rerenga Kuaotunu Road
RD 2
Kuaotunu West
Whitianga
3592
12 Black Jack Road
Kūaotunu 3592
Kuaotunu West
Kūaotunu
3592

Charity's other details

07 866 2770


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Kuaotunu Hall Committee manages, maintains and supports the operation of the Kuaotunu Hall, so that the Hall can continue to be used and enjoyed by the local Kuaotunu community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Community hall/community local & non local

Other (please state)

(Community), Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Hall Committee administers the operation of the Hall. The committee usually has between 5 and 8 members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 19/08/2023 $19,975 $21,081
31/12/2022 30/12/2022 $9,352 $25,656
31/12/2021 30/12/2021 $18,553 $4,900
31/12/2020 1/10/2020 $14,259 $38,198
31/12/2019 25/09/2019 $29,848 $23,402
31/12/2018 11/10/2018 $25,359 $20,741
31/12/2017 31/12/2017 $47,834 $34,021
31/12/2016 30/12/2016 $27,159 $14,883
31/12/2015 10/09/2015 $20,147 $15,863
31/12/2014 24/09/2014 $13,196 $1,683

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kim Crosland Secretary 3/02/2022
Waling Kakebeeke Committee member 30/11/2017
Judith Odel Wicks Committee Member 19/12/2016
Jo Mullins Committee member 8/03/2016
John Thorburn Committee member 23/02/2016
Kathy Speirs Treasurer / Bookings Manager 23/02/2016
Carrie Parker Chairwoman 24/02/2015
Harriette Brickell Committee member 24/02/2015
Maxine McRobbie Committee member 24/02/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rebecca Jayne Simpson Committee Member 23/11/2019
Jocelyn Margaret Worsfold Committee Member 10/10/2017
Irene Werschlan Committee member 9/12/2016
Alan Bosselmann Executive Officer 27/04/2015
Douglas Russell Chairperson 27/04/2015
Jane Lesley Russell Treasurer 27/04/2015
Richard White Committee member 27/04/2015
Gael Coleman Minutes Secretary 21/12/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/02/2022 NOC013
21/02/2020 NOC010
28/04/2018 NOC007
22/05/2017 NOC005
29/05/2016 NOC003
19/05/2016 NOC002
26/09/2013 AR001

Charity Documents