pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Safeguarding Children Initiative
The Trustees Safeguarding Children Initiative
CC49059
9429043276134
Registered

Registration details

19/04/2013
March 31

Address for service

142 Saxton Road East
Stoke
Nelson
7011

Charity's other details

027 772 4469
Facebook icon image
safeguarding children initiative


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Safeguarding Children Initiative is a charitable organisation which aims to reduce child abuse and neglect in New Zealand by: - Delivering evidence-based seminars and training to empower those working with children and communities to protect children and young people. - Safeguarding Community / Safe Communities - Safer Children - work with community organisations to increase their culture of child protection, capacity, systems, and workforce development. - Elearning - New Zealand's leading child protection elearning provider. Using information Technology to improve access to vital child protection training across the nation. We have now have three courses available. - Advocacy for children and young people at a local and national level. We believe every child matters and for the most vulnerable children everyday matters. Children rely on the adults and community around them to understand the potentially devastating impact of what they are experiencing and take action to help.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Health, Community development, Social services

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Safeguarding Children Initiative (SCI) is a charitable trust with 5 trustees. We employ: A CEO An Operations Manager 2 Safeguarding Child Protection Consultant 1 Accounts & Payroll Administrator 1 Course Administrator 1 Digital Projects Co-ordinator 1 Operational Support Contracted in subject experts as required (All our team work on a part-time basis)

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2022 13/11/2022 $707,524 $540,115
30/09/2021 21/09/2021 $612,113 $391,976
30/09/2020 9/09/2020 $383,124 $362,424
30/11/2019 13/11/2019 $275,204 $247,955
30/11/2018 21/11/2018 $190,569 $202,150
30/09/2017 27/08/2017 $245,358 $179,563
30/09/2016 29/11/2016 $60,703 $111,590
30/09/2015 23/12/2015 $89,906 $38,439
30/09/2014 30/09/2014 $40,554 $21,083

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Timothy Alexander Stuart Houston Trustee 3/05/2022
Lisa Jennings Trustee 25/11/2021
Brendon Silcock Trustee 26/11/2020
Christine Joy Meade Trustee 11/08/2015
Neil John Kitchen Trustee 1/09/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul Gerard Rosanowski Trustee 1/08/2022
Koren Grason Trustee 27/02/2022
Annette Margaret Milligan Trustee 25/11/2021
ChristinE Jan Palmer Trustee 26/10/2021
Julia Margaret McCarthy Trustee 4/07/2020
Helen Watson Trustee 21/11/2019
Mark John Shadwick Trustee 20/06/2018
Geoffrey Te Puni Mullen Trustee 26/05/2018
Dawn (Willow) Duffy Trustee 25/07/2017
Keith Marshall Trustee 20/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/08/2022 NOC024
7/06/2022 NOC023
7/03/2022 NOC022
2/03/2022 NOC021
6/01/2022 NOC020
4/12/2021 NOC019
10/03/2021 NOC017
20/08/2020 NOC015
23/01/2020 NOC014
11/09/2018 NOC011

Charity Documents