pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Wanaka Watersports Facility Trust
CC50034
9429043279357
Registered

Registration details

2/12/2013
March 31

Address for service

14 Hikuwai Drive
Albert Town
Wanaka
9305
51 Wanaka-Mount Aspiring Road
Wanaka 9305
Maori Hill
Wanaka
9305

Charity's other details

021 053 8929


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To establish and operate a non-motorised watersports facility building at Lake Wanaka for user groups and the community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Children / young people, Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated charitable trust board under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 21/08/2023 $35,687 $28,985
30/09/2022 30/08/2022 $134,609 $28,481
30/09/2021 25/08/2021 $197,431 $24,106
30/09/2020 17/09/2020 $975,102 $11,727
30/09/2019 11/09/2019 $592,193 $515
30/09/2018 20/08/2018 $60,025 $343
30/09/2017 13/09/2017 $154,702 $15
30/09/2016 27/10/2016 $52,331 $1,227
30/09/2015 20/08/2015 $53,026 $8,169
30/09/2014 23/09/2014 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Claire Elizabeth Radford Trustee 11/08/2022
Marjorie Cook Trustee 11/08/2022
Peter Anthony Eley Trustee 11/08/2022
Shane Andrew Gibson Trustee 11/08/2022
Jacqueline Boyd Trustee 28/08/2018
Jaime Hutter Trustee 5/05/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Carolyn Jane Wallis Trustee 11/08/2022
Michael John Murray Sidey Trustee 11/08/2022
Mick Hollyer Trustee 11/08/2022
Nicola Robyn Blennerhassett Trustee 19/08/2019
Jerard Doug Robinson Trustee 28/08/2018
Kevin Gingel-Kent Trustee 12/10/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/10/2022 NOC019
9/12/2021 NOC017
10/11/2019 NOC014
10/11/2019 NOC013
18/09/2019 NOC012
31/08/2018 NOC010
15/10/2017 NOC008
2/09/2016 NOC005
29/08/2015 NOC004
30/10/2014 NOC003

Charity Documents