pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Our Lady's Home of Compassion Island Bay Limited
Home of Compassion
CC10106
9429038295294
Registered

Registration details

25/03/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1474
Wellington
6140
2 Rhine Street
Island Bay
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details

(04)3834952


Group Members


Below are all the members of Sisters of Compassion Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Compassion Housing Limited
Our Lady's Home of Compassion Island Bay Limited
Saint Joseph's Home of Compassion Heretaunga Limited
Sisters of Compassion Group Limited
Suzanne Aubert Compassion Centre Wellington Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Compassion is the central theme that drives the services we provide. Following the mission of Jesus, and in the spirit of Suzanne Aubert, we offer hospitality and support with loving concern and compassion.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Board of Trustees, CEO, leadership team, Guest services Manager, Finance, administration, reception, kitchen, maintenance and housekeeping staff
Sisters of Compassion Group Limited

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/01/2023 26/01/2023 $1,307,958 $1,133,878
31/12/2021 31/12/2021 $1,141,196 $1,140,484
31/12/2020 30/11/2020 $881,073 $959,404
31/12/2019 2/12/2019 $918,519 $920,936
31/12/2018 2/10/2018 $783,920 $802,941
31/12/2017 2/05/2018 $808,931 $806,085
31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $822,013 $744,837
31/12/2015 12/01/2016 $793,495 $765,876
31/12/2014 18/02/2015 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nigel Arthur Prince Director 12/09/2023
Alisi Paea 'i Vaiola Tu'iPulotu Director 19/07/2023
Deirdre Nga Roimata O'Sullivan Director 19/07/2023
Julian Michael Maher Director 19/07/2023
Michael Gerard Curtis Director 19/07/2023
Gerard John Tully Director 3/02/2020
Susan Cosgrove Director 1/07/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roger Michael John Havell Director 17/07/2023
Sarina Pratley Director 17/07/2023
Peter John Cullen Director/Chair 30/06/2021
Gerard Michael McGreevy Chief Executive 30/11/2020
Xiafang Huang Accountant 30/11/2020
Ailsa Georgina Diamond Accountant 30/06/2016
Deirdre Nga Roimata O'Sullivan Director 30/06/2016
Peter Cullen Chairman 30/06/2016
Peter Anthony Gibbs Director 30/06/2016
Cicely Elizabeth Hurring Director 30/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/08/2023 NOC025
26/07/2023 NOC024
3/01/2022 NOC022
25/02/2020 NOC019
25/02/2020 NOC018
24/02/2020 NOC017
13/01/2020 NOC016
7/01/2020 NOC015
13/06/2016 NOC010
16/01/2015 NOC009

Charity Documents