Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MUSEUMS AOTEAROA TE TARI O NGA WHARE TAONGA O TE MOTU THE MUSEUMS OF NEW ZEALAND INCORPORATED
The Museums of New Zealand Inc
CC32927
9429042766513
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 10928
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
169 Tory Street
104 The Terrace
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04) 499 1313
https://www.facebook.com/museumsaotearoa/
instagram: museumsaotearoa


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Museums Aotearoa's vision is for Aotearoa New Zealand to have thriving and sustainable museums. We do this by advocating on behalf of members and the sector, nurturing excellence in professional practice, and extending manaakitanga toward our members. Everything we do is underpinned by a commitment to the principles of Te Tiriti o Waitangi.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Arts / culture / heritage

Other charities

General public, public museums and art galleries and their staff

Entity Structure

Museums Aotearoa is an incorporated society focused on supporting the public museums and galleries and those who work with them in Aotearoa New Zealand. Museums Aotearoa is governed by a Board comprising a minimum of six individuals elected by members according to the Rules. The Board meets quarterly. The Board employs a Chief Executive, who is responsible for the day to day running of the organisation, including employment of additional staff. Total staffing is approximately 2 FTE.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 28/06/2023 $712,559 $253,345 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 31/05/2022 $253,173 $277,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $309,565 $222,282 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 4/07/2020 $482,421 $380,492 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2019 $459,323 $356,297 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/08/2018 4/09/2018 $477,787 $410,715 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 3/08/2017 $791,297 $762,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 8/07/2016 $448,321 $404,022 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $373,085 $332,511 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Carolyn Patrice Roberts-Thompson Board Member 21/06/2023
Jadene Hunia Te Wha Huff Board Member 21/06/2023
Janneen Kathrin Love Board Member 21/06/2023
David Douglas Reeves Board Member 9/06/2022
Susanna Shadbolt Board Member 24/06/2021
Eloise Dorothy Wallace Board Member 13/05/2021
Lucinda Gay Livingston Blackley-Jimson Board Member 13/05/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Amber Aranui Board Member 21/06/2023
Tui Mihi Te Hau Board Member 1/02/2023
Ian Paul Griffin Board Member 6/12/2021
Paora Tibble Board Member 24/06/2021
Bridget Mosley Board Member 9/04/2021
Elizabeth Margaret Cotton Board Member 9/04/2021
Jamie Averill Metzger Board Member 9/04/2021
Jenny Harper Board member 9/04/2021
Louisa Hormann Board Member 9/04/2021
Mark Athol Sykes Board Member 9/04/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/07/2023 NOC034
27/06/2022 NOC032
15/03/2022 NOC029
23/06/2021 NOC027
20/06/2021 NOC026
20/06/2021 NOC025
20/06/2021 NOC024
17/06/2021 NOC023
15/07/2020 NOC021
11/11/2019 NOC019
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.