Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Liberty Christian Church
Liberty Church
CC23678
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

119 Richardson Road
Mount Albert
Auckland
1025

Charity's other details

09 8200168


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Church is called by God to work with others in making Jesus Christ known through connecting people to God and assisting them to know who God has called them to be, teaching and nurturing people in Christian faith, loving service responding to human need, proclaiming the Gospel, seeking to transform society and caring for God's creation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Church is one of 250 churches that make up the Baptist Union of NZ (BUNZ). However the church is autonomous with the church eldership being the chief governing body of the entity. Each area of church life has a ministry director responsible for it. The operations are managed by a staff team consisting of a Senior Leader, Executive Pastor, Worship Pastor and Financial Administrator. The Church entity incorporates a trust, Liberty Impact Community Trust, a charitable trust - Reg # CC29494.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Liberty Impact Community Trust CC29494

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 31/07/2024 19/07/2024 $900,592 $952,791 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 26/06/2023 $772,181 $844,370 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 12/06/2022 $495,129 $620,578 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $296,922 $435,596 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/08/2020 30/08/2020 $3,211,995 $732,543 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $873,055 $1,075,774 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 29/06/2018 $967,803 $1,095,771 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $1,078,884 $1,115,108 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $723,011 $727,953 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Haara Mete Elder 29/05/2019
Anthony Michael Steele Elder 16/06/2016
Kevin Tribe Elder 16/06/2015
Susan Elizabeth Hodson Executive Pastor 4/04/2012
Trent Hodson Senior Pastor 15/11/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ian Whye Elder 10/05/2022
Karen Vickery Elder 20/09/2016
Wayne Sila'ila'i Elder 24/06/2014
Grant Douglas Witheford Treasurer 5/10/2013
Mark Hedley Elder 31/12/2011
Raymond Lockett Elder 17/05/2011
John Keall Elder 31/03/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/02/2017 NOC012
28/06/2016 NOC011
27/06/2016 NOC010
18/08/2015 NOC009
11/06/2015 NOC008
5/11/2014 NOC007
31/10/2014 NOC006
28/06/2012 AR005
22/06/2011 NOC002
24/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.