Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Parent Aid Kaipara Incorporated
Parent Aid North West
CC20276
9429042990567
Registered

Registration details

17/12/2007
January 31

Address for service

PO Box 5
Helensville
840
1 Porter Crescent
Helensville 0800
Helensville
0800

Charity's other details

(09) 420 7002
https://www.facebook.com/ParentAidNorthWest/
https://givealittle.co.nz/org/parent-aid-kaipara-incorporated


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Strengthening whanau in our community by providing free practical home support

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society, Trust - not for profit organisation with Governance provided by a voluntary Board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2024 31/07/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/01/2023 31/07/2023 21/06/2023 $158,321 $162,436 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 1/07/2022 $167,262 $154,407 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 26/07/2021 $140,661 $123,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 19/07/2020 $107,444 $141,569 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 3/07/2019 $118,012 $126,601 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 1/08/2018 $101,652 $101,047 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 31/07/2017 $110,579 $94,088 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 7/06/2016 $100,891 $109,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2015 31/07/2015 12/07/2015 $114,642 $120,874 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nelene de Beer Board Member 17/10/2022
Louise Pengelly Treasurer and Privacy Officer 22/09/2020
Suzanne McCracken General Manager 21/01/2019
Amy Wood Secretary 15/11/2018
Alison Jule Seakens Chairperson and Complaints Officer 11/04/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Esther Te Aotonga Complaints Officer 20/06/2023
Diane Pope Staff Representative 21/11/2022
Kennedy Pirret Treasurer 28/06/2022
Beverley Meikle Staff Representative/Board Member 26/05/2021
Louise Painton Treasurer 23/03/2021
Louise Clunie Board Member 26/05/2020
Renee Blair Board member 22/11/2019
Phillipa Baker Treasurer 1/08/2019
Pauline Smit Committee Member 29/07/2019
Kim Gordon Manager 19/12/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/05/2023 NOC038
19/04/2021 NOC035
9/04/2021 NOC034
20/07/2020 NOC033
27/05/2020 NOC031
11/12/2019 NOC030
24/09/2019 NOC029
5/09/2019 NOC028
8/04/2019 NOC026
18/03/2019 NOC025
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.