pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


M S Waikato Trust
MS Waikato
CC29667
9429042985037
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 146
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
20 Palmerston Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 834 4740
Facebook icon image
http://www.facebook.com/MS-Waikato-1865949090309722


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The provision of support, education, information and advocacy services to people affected by Multiple Sclerosis, Huntington's Disease and allied neurological conditions. Our vision is people living their best lives. We will achieve our vision by supporting, informing and empowering our people in an effective and sustainable way.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Support, education, information, advocacy

People with disabilities

Health

People with disabilities

Family / whanau, Carers

Entity Structure

MS Waikato is governed by a board of Voluntary Trustees. Trustees are elected for a two year term and the board must consist of not less than 5 Trustees. Trustees are able to co-opt up to 4 additional Trustees to provide additional skills or expertise that may be needed. Trustees elect a Chairperson and Deputy Chairperson. MS Waikato employs 3 part time staff, 2 are Client services staff who are responsible for providing support services to clients and an Administration Manager.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Generation Trust (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $194,503 $212,150
30/06/2020 17/06/2020 $207,779 $205,867
30/06/2019 18/06/2020 $234,834 $210,333
31/07/2018 1/07/2018 $179,891 $205,490
30/06/2017 31/07/2017 $183,732 $201,997
30/06/2016 27/06/2016 $204,551 $192,165
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $190,505 $198,898
30/06/2014 18/06/2014 $184,298 $179,854
30/06/2013 28/06/2013 $144,118 $181,868

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amber Margaret Hammill Trustee 28/04/2022
Euan Reeve Trustee 17/03/2022
Rebecca Watson Trustee 2/12/2021
David Cordery Deputy Chairperson 25/03/2021
Keith Small Chairperson 21/03/2019
Micheal Tuck Trustee 2/08/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Desley Faye Clarke (Park) Chairperson 17/03/2022
Graham Derrick Trustee 17/03/2022
Mark Etheridge Trustee 17/03/2022
Marsha Marshall Deputy Chairperson 25/03/2021
William Joseph Hughes Trustee 25/03/2021
Leanne Milligan Trustee 21/03/2019
Chris Luoni Trustee 28/03/2018
Clare Simcock Trustee 28/03/2018
Frankie Letford Trustee (elected) 28/03/2018
Erin Burke Trustee 23/01/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/05/2022 NOC025
27/04/2022 NOC024
10/06/2021 NOC022
23/07/2018 NOC019
27/06/2018 NOC017
9/08/2017 NOC016
27/06/2016 NOC014
27/06/2016 NOC013
22/06/2016 NOC012
22/06/2016 NOC011

Charity Documents