Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Breast Health Foundation Incorporated
CC44945
9429043226023
Deregistered
10/03/2023
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Breast Health Foundation Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

17/08/2010
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 10/03/2023 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 17/08/2010

Address for service

C/O DR PAUL BUTLER
50 East Coast Road
Milford
Auckland
620

Charity's other details

094490005


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To facilitate the maintenance of good breast health through education and the provision of information to the public. To promote and facilitate research supporting breast health. To advocate for policy which supports breast health.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation

Other (please state)

(Women), General public

Entity Structure

Holding pattern

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 13/12/2020 $1 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 13/12/2020 $1 $40 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 13/12/2018 $2 $1 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $2,002 $341 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 13/11/2016 $300 $396 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 17/11/2015 $3 $413 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 31/10/2014 $5 $412 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 31/10/2013 $18 $1,286 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Penny Ann Ballinger Board member 1/12/2015
Paul Garth Butler Officer 11/09/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Janice Marye Adams Secretary 1/12/2015
Phillip Cottingham Secretary 30/11/2015
Michael John Cushman Chairman 30/07/2013
Sharon Erdrich Treasurer 31/05/2012
Chelsea Morrison Treasurer 31/03/2011
Sherril Burton Chairperson 31/03/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/11/2017 NOC008
31/10/2013 AR004
11/09/2013 NOC003
4/10/2012 AR003
24/11/2011 AR002
9/11/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.