Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pakuranga Baptist Church
PBC
CC21885
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 51538
Pakuranga
Auckland
2140
219 Ti Rakau Drive
Pakuranga Heights
Auckland
2010

Charity's other details

(09)5768403
(09)5767631
https://www.facebook.com/pakurangabaptistchurch/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provision of religious services and religious activities for members and the general public. The kindergarten provides pre-school education.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Trust structure with governance provided by an elected board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 1/05/2024 $817,593 $765,245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 17/07/2023 5/09/2023 $693,038 $728,471 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2022 $791,927 $757,980 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 31/07/2021 27/07/2021 $861,980 $894,884 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 9/02/2021 $900,098 $901,594 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 22/04/2020 $869,667 $842,481 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/08/2018 3/12/2018 $881,664 $860,588 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 31/08/2017 $927,610 $989,176 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 22/06/2016 $939,462 $868,131 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Lewis Board Member 28/04/2024
David Chou Board Member 1/01/2023
Annabelle Avery Board Member 15/04/2018
Albert Lee Board member 1/01/2018
Andrew James Brown Board Member 23/11/1995

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tim Neale Board Member 14/08/2023
Kevin Brown Board Member 31/12/2019
Sandi Hazelwood Board Member 31/12/2019
David Pai-Yi Chou Board Member 31/12/2018
Trevor Armstrong Board Member 31/12/2017
Jimmy Koh Board member 31/12/2016
Tim Neale Board Member 31/12/2015
Sandy Hazelwood Trustee 31/12/2014
Sally Stainton Board Member 31/12/2013
Ramen Jairam Patel Board Member 31/12/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/02/2023 NOC020
22/04/2020 NOC014
20/08/2019 NOC013
14/08/2019 NOC012
9/06/2015 NOC009
25/06/2014 NOC008
26/06/2013 AR006
18/02/2013 NOC003
28/06/2012 AR005
30/06/2011 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.