pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Protect Our Winters New Zealand
CC56557
9429046987075
Registered

Registration details

16/04/2019
March 31

Address for service

15 Hikuwai Drive
Albert Town
9305

Charity's other details

0220631603
Facebook icon image
protectourwintersnz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Protect Our Winters Aotearoa connects passionate outdoor people and everyone who loves and needs winter to generate positive climate action. We focus on educational initiatives and community-based empowerment to preserve New Zealand’s alpine environment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

Our main operations are based in Wanaka, with additional networks accross NZ. We have a maximum of ten officers that constitute our executive board, including the director, treasurer, secretary and riders alliance coordinator. We are affiliated with Protect Our Winters based in the United States. They provide guidance and support but have limited control over our operations. We are also part of the global network of Protect Our Winters branches.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 27/01/2023 $27,209 $29,131
30/09/2021 27/10/2021 $26,463 $16,562
30/09/2020 1/11/2020 $22,556 $6,908

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alex Holmes Treasurer 7/03/2022
Anna Keeling Board Member 7/03/2022
Anna Smoothy Board Member 7/03/2022
Iain Menmuir Chair 7/03/2022
Rachel Cooper Board Member 7/03/2022
Samuel Young Sectretary 7/03/2022
Todd Redpath Board Member 7/03/2022
Jana McCall Committee Member Administration 1/03/2021
Marian Krogh Director 7/06/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emma Fordyce General Officer 6/03/2022
Marian Krogh Treasurer 6/03/2022
Melanie Joan Lloyd Secretary 6/03/2022
Corrah Phillips Riders Alliance Coordinator 1/03/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/03/2022 NOC008
23/03/2022 NOC007
23/03/2022 NOC006
20/03/2022 NOC005
19/03/2022 NOC004
12/03/2022 NOC003

Charity Documents