pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sir Edmund Hillary Outdoors Education Trust
Hillary Outdoors Education Centres
CC26731
9429042888666
Registered

Registration details

26/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Sir Edmund Hillary Out Door Pursuits Centre of New Zealand 27/06/2008
Sir Edmund Hillary Outdoors Education Trust 1/10/2014

Address for service

PO Box 76371
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
Hydro Access R D 3
State Highway 47
Turangi
3334

Charity's other details

0800 688 843
07 386 0204


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide education in all its forms in outdoor pursuits.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Hillary Outdoors is a registered charitable trust run by a board of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
22/01/2021 22/12/2020 $4,256,348 $4,606,491
30/09/2019 3/10/2019 $5,330,937 $5,409,200
30/06/2018 20/06/2018 $4,054,649 $4,118,350
30/06/2017 26/06/2017 $3,863,785 $3,996,151
30/06/2016 23/06/2016 $3,504,165 $3,688,138
30/06/2015 19/05/2015 $3,506,504 $3,721,255
30/06/2014 1/08/2014 $3,412,161 $3,776,136
30/06/2013 29/05/2013 $3,257,718 $3,600,921
30/06/2012 8/06/2012 $3,005,071 $3,471,984

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 January 2018 - 31 March 2019.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kylie Ann Leonard Trustee 20/04/2021
David Christopher Tommas Trustee 11/10/2020
John Ham Trustee 11/10/2020
Will McKay Trustee 11/10/2020
Jarrod Walker Trustee 26/08/2019
Simon Bendall Trustee 26/11/2018
Paul Walsh Trustee 26/11/2017
Bronwyn Lawrence Trustee 28/11/2016
Tony Gault Risk and Finance Committee 14/08/2015
Mark Copeland Trustee 26/08/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anne Dignan Trustee 2/03/2020
Iain Morrison Trustee 26/11/2018
Clive Tilby Trustee 29/05/2017
Thea Depetris Trustee 27/02/2017
Mervyn English Main Committee 28/06/2016
David Kenrick Beeche Trustee 23/05/2016
Rupert John Wilson Trustee 23/05/2016
Wayne Cyril Arthur Hughes Trustee 13/08/2015
Suzanne Janissen Trustee 18/05/2015
Mike Brown Trustee 20/05/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/05/2021 NOC029
3/11/2020 NOC026
3/11/2020 NOC025
7/11/2019 NOC021
22/02/2019 NOC019
27/11/2018 NOC017
4/12/2017 NOC015
19/10/2017 NOC014
9/10/2017 NOC013
16/05/2016 NOC010

Charity Documents