pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Plymouth Little Theatre Society Inc
CC20858
9429042685005
Registered

Registration details

18/04/2021
December 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
Registered 18/04/2021
De-registered 4/02/2021 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 31/01/2008

Address for service

PO Box 757
Taranaki Mail Centre
New Plymouth
4340
29 Aubrey Street
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

06 7582631
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/nplittletheatre/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote, encourage and foster excellence in the production, performance, reading, study and writing of theatrical works for the edification and benefit of the community. To promote and encourage the contribution of the community to the production performance, reading, study and writing of theatrical works for the benefit of the community as a whole. To Foster an appreciation of artistic theatrical works for the enhancement development and benefit of the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

The main sources of income are generated from show productions throughout the year. These shows sometimes have dinner and bar facilities available which is also a income generating part of the society. Income is also received from members subscriptions and hireage of the facilities to outside people and organisations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 8/06/2019 $91,172 $55,096
30/06/2017 18/04/2017 $73,031 $47,741
30/06/2016 18/04/2017 $48,279 $39,212
30/06/2015 29/06/2015 $116,853 $71,351
30/06/2014 3/07/2014 $45,276 $46,541
30/06/2013 28/06/2013 $54,022 $38,956
30/06/2012 20/03/2012 $0 $0
30/06/2011 21/03/2011 $36,264 $19,840
30/06/2010 8/04/2010 $41,107 $34,603
30/06/2009 1/02/2010 $39,412 $32,041

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gillian Gibbon Committee Member 16/03/2022
Kaila LeMaitre Committee Member 16/03/2022
Sandie MacDiarmid Committee Member 16/03/2022
John Lawson Treasurer 15/06/2021
Suzy Adair Vice President 24/03/2021
Christine King Committee 18/04/2019
Nathan Grange Committee Member 18/03/2019
Shona Edwards Membership Officer 18/03/2019
Mary NA Barron Secretary 6/03/2019
Stella Tracey McCallum President 6/03/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jor-El Shaman Committee member 12/04/2022
John Lawson Committee member 16/03/2022
Tash Paton Treasurer 15/06/2021
Shona Maree Edwards Treasurer 18/03/2020
Lynne Cameron Treasurer 13/10/2018
Chris Watson President 18/06/2018
Laurie Neville Vice President 18/06/2018
Tasha Paton Secretary 19/06/2017
Katherine Wolfe Secretary 19/04/2017
Laurie Neville Treasurer 19/04/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/06/2021 NOC016
5/10/2017 NOC014
15/08/2017 NOC013
19/04/2017 NOC010
19/04/2017 NOC009
22/06/2013 AR006
20/03/2012 AR005
21/03/2011 AR004
8/04/2010 AR003
14/07/2009 NOC003

Charity Documents