pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Incorporated
New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited
Search and Rescue Institute New Zealand (SARINZ) Limited

Group Details


New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group

Registration details

Registered
13/06/2019
CC56750
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13182
Armagh
Phillipstown
Christchurch
8141
Unit 8, 35 Sir William Pickering Drive
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Group's other details

03 374 2424


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 28/11/2022 $6,038,233 $5,966,811
31/12/2021 15/12/2021 $6,200,824 $5,577,536
31/12/2020 3/12/2020 $4,429,709 $4,160,295
31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $4,537,774 $4,435,170

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Group's charitable purpose is to provide Search and Rescue services for the Lost, Missing and Injured throughout New Zealand. To further the education of the public of New Zealand in matters related to Search and Rescue. To provide education, training and assessment for the purposes of developing and retaining an internationally credible, effective and efficient Search and Rescue capability throughout New Zealand at a standard equal to or better than international best practice.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group comprises New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Incorporated and its controlled entities, New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited, and the Search and Rescue Institute New Zealand (SARINZ) Limited . A Board of seven directors oversee the governance of the entities.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/10/2020 NOC002

Group Documents