Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Volunteering Hawkes Bay
CC33912
9429042715658
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

200 Market Street North
Hastings
4122

Charity's other details

06 391 5476
VolunteeringHB
volunteering_hawkes_bay


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission - Valued, Supported, Connected Providing referral services of community volunteers to organisations to build connections across Hawke's Bay. Key goals include advocacy for volunteering, recognition and celebration of volunteers and for VHB to be recognised throughout Hawke's Bay as the hub for volunteer excellence.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Refer volunteers to member organisationsSupport organisations with all volunteer management needs

Promotion of volunteering

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

General public

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/10/2023 $479,468 $226,963 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 6/01/2023 $137,945 $141,302 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 6/10/2021 $90,647 $102,563 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 13/12/2020 $100,456 $99,927 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 25/11/2019 $98,341 $101,506 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 30/12/2018 $96,627 $88,421 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/12/2018 $79,096 $88,877 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/01/2017 $85,783 $85,243 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 19/11/2015 $88,620 $83,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 8/02/2015 $93,590 $90,903 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jody Moana Hamilton Trustee 12/03/2024
Margot Elizabeth Minett Earwaker Chairperson 12/04/2023
Grace Audrey Rose Moore Trustee 12/08/2022
Satyam Saha Trustee/Treasurer 10/09/2021
Barbara Herbert Trustee 20/04/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Edward William Brewster Trustee 14/05/2024
Wenhua Yang Trustee/Secretary 14/11/2023
Christine Schmidli Trustee 9/11/2023
Kenneth Simons Trustee/Chair Seconded 7/10/2023
Rachael Jane Luxton Trustee 9/12/2022
Roberta Budvietas Trustee/Chair 4/04/2022
Jenny Grace Trustee 5/10/2021
Vaibhav Raj Pathi Trustee/Treasurer 10/08/2021
Paolo Henrique Andreo Baronceli Trustee 9/07/2021
Rachel Jane Luxton Trustee 4/03/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/03/2024 NOC043
10/11/2023 NOC042
27/10/2023 NOC041
7/10/2023 NOC038
10/08/2023 NOC037
11/04/2023 NOC036
29/03/2023 NOC035
25/08/2022 NOC033
1/05/2022 NOC032
22/09/2021 NOC030
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.