pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


A.D.H.D. Association Incorporated
ADHD Association Inc
CC20648
9429042572176
Registered

Registration details

24/01/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 9063
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
YARNTON HOUSE
14 Erson Avenue
Royal Oak
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

(09)6251754
Facebook icon image
ADHDNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to educate, support and advocate for those affected by ADHD by: Assisting people in making informed choices Being a credible national voice Being a centre of excellence for services offered Providing a repository of information accessible to all

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Public meetings

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Communities/families

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public, Schools communities

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 29/08/2022 $101,856 $98,069
30/09/2021 31/07/2021 $90,069 $95,101
30/09/2020 18/06/2020 $99,886 $97,586
30/09/2019 4/07/2019 $111,616 $97,559
30/09/2018 4/10/2018 $107,536 $99,331
30/09/2017 3/10/2017 $84,356 $86,987
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $85,856 $78,787
30/09/2015 5/08/2015 $83,674 $78,693
30/09/2014 6/09/2014 $68,317 $70,431

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tracey Rountree Trustee 9/07/2021
Andrew Ward Trustee/Treasurer 1/02/2021
Katherine Mason Trustee 1/02/2021
Suzanne Cookson Trustee/CEO 1/02/2021
Brett C Harrington Trustee 24/06/2015
Sarah Watson Clinical Advisor/Trustee 29/05/2014
Darrin Mark Bull Chairperson 31/05/2011
John Forbes Miller Trustee/Secretary 5/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Mairs Trustee/Treasurer 1/02/2022
Helen Moore Committee member 1/02/2021
Rebecca Mary Russell Committee member 2/02/2020
Chris Thomas Event Manager 21/05/2019
Leeanna Kohn Committee member 29/05/2018
Michael Schneider Committee 29/05/2018
Heidi Nilsson Committee 8/08/2017
Anna Redgrave Committee 24/05/2016
David Mitchell Committee Member 24/05/2016
Karen Elizabeth Lusis Committee 24/05/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/07/2021 NOC021
19/06/2020 NOC019
5/07/2019 NOC017
22/08/2018 NOC015
7/09/2016 NOC012
5/08/2015 NOC011
14/07/2015 NOC010
15/08/2013 AR007
3/07/2012 AR006
8/06/2011 AR005

Charity Documents