Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Yuan Tao Temple Charitable Trust
CC37766
9429042961628
Registered

Registration details

16/02/2009
March 31

Address for service

411 Whitford Road
Whitford
2571

Charity's other details

09 530 8992


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects for which the charity was established are: 1. To join together in NZ to promote and spread the philosophy & practice of Confucism, Taoism & Buddhism. 2. To represent and advocate the views & wishes of all members & followers of the Confucism, Taoism & Buddhism religions. 3. To promote & be concerned with the enhancement of moral education in relation to respect for parent, teachers, neighbours & fellowmen as laid down by Confucius', Taoist & Buddhist teachings. 4. To edit, print, publish & circulate such publications as approved by the executive committee as being for the edification or education of members & followers. 5. To join with any other person, group or association for the accomplishing of any of the objects of the society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Buddist and Daoist temple

Religious activities

Buddist and Daoist temple

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Buddhist believers

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 8/11/2024 $1,397,141 $143,657 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/08/2023 $621,614 $68,572 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 8/09/2022 $357,323 $74,842 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 12/10/2021 $407,163 $54,095 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 24/11/2021 $115,489 $38,778 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 2/08/2019 $137,111 $55,644 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 18/07/2018 $79,337 $59,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 13/10/2017 $137,018 $72,543 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 31/10/2016 $174,862 $149,229 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
guiying chen trustee 23/01/2025
Jian Zheng trustee 24/09/2023
wanting w wu trustee 24/09/2023
XIN YANG TRUSTEE 24/09/2023
Yinghui Ren Chairperson 13/10/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Zeng Lijun Trustee 23/01/2025
Ku Chunghsiao Trustee 24/09/2023
Zhang Daming Trustee 24/09/2023
Su Jie Zhu Trustee 31/07/2018
Huiying Sun Chairperson 1/01/2017
Yewlee Chan Trustee 1/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/01/2025 NOC015
17/08/2015 NOC005
30/09/2013 AR005
24/01/2012 NOC002
21/10/2011 AR003
18/10/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.