pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ren Xue International Charitable Trust
RXI
CC56324
9429043308668
Registered

Registration details

20/06/2018
December 31

Address for service

101 Cluny Road
Plimmerton
Porirua
5026

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/renxueinternational


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our vision is a world where all people experience harmony – within their own lives, their personal relationships, society and with nature. The purpose of the Charitable Trust is to provide a clear path through Ren Xue for people to experience health, happiness, a sense of wellbeing, realisation and wisdom, and a meaningful way to contribute to the world. This includes sharing Yuan Gong, an easy to learn, safe and effective type of Qigong that offers still and moving meditations, which reduce stress and help to focus the mind.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Charitable Trust is governed by a Board of between 2&7 members - which holds responsibility for the strategic direction of the organisation. Direct oversight of operations is delegated to a Global Council, made up of representatives from each the continental Ren Xue organisations (non-profits operating in the Americas, Europe, Africa and Australasia), plus a Trustee of the Board. There are three employees (2 full-time and 1 part-time), supported by project and programme-based contractors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2023 25/07/2023 $1,025,163 $1,107,382
29/07/2022 29/07/2022 $1,295,669 $1,129,552
30/06/2021 25/05/2021 $1,295,669 $1,129,552
30/06/2020 30/06/2020 $1,081,028 $996,963
30/06/2019 27/06/2019 $0 $0
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover 7 months, from 20 June 2018 (date of registration) to 31 December 2018.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Heidi Alker Trustee 29/03/2023
Hsiou-chen Kung Trustee 24/06/2016
Hsiou-chen Kung Liu Duplicate entry - See Hsiou-chen Kung 24/06/2016
Rhonwen Seager Trustee 24/06/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Knight Trustee 21/12/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/03/2023 NOC008
7/05/2019 NOC003
26/04/2019 NOC002
28/03/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents