Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ramakrishna Vedanta Centre
CC60351
9429050147182
Registered

Registration details

29/04/2022
March 31

Address for service

27 Arawa Street
New Lynn
Auckland
0600

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Vedanta Centre is a spiritual, not for profit, charitable organisation. Its mission is to: a) To impart and promote the study and practice of the universal principles of Vedanta philosophy, mediation, science, arts, industries, harmony of religions according to the aims, ideals and activities of the Ramakrishna Math, India for the holistic (physical, mental, emotional, ethical and spiritual) wellbeing of individuals and society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Governed by the rules within the Deed of Charitable Trust as registered with the New Zealand Companies Office, with trustees and office bearers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 12/07/2023 $94,271 $19,422 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Harish Kumar Vice President 26/08/2021
Chtan Patel Secretary 7/08/2021
Swami Tadananda President 7/08/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/11/2022 NOC003
24/11/2022 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.