Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Citizen AI Limited
CC56018
9429046709059
Deregistered
30/06/2021

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Citizen AI Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

14/08/2018
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/06/2021 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 14/08/2018

Address for service

PO Box 24005
Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6142
Suite 1
Level 4
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

https://twitter.com/citizenai_nz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Purpose of Citizen AI Limited is to provide education and provide benefits to the community in New Zealand through informing and educating the community about their legal rights and obligations, the legal system and non-legal matters that are beneficial to the community. Citizen AI Limited will research, develop, promote and provide artificial intelligence systems which aim to improve the accessibility of basic legal information in the New Zealand Community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Citizen AI Limited is a limited liability company with a board of two directors who exercise independent control of the company. Citizen AI Limited is wholly owned by the Community Law Wellington and Hutt Valley Trust, a registered charitable trust (number 2621033).
Community Law Wellington and Hutt Valley Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 10/01/2021 $234,686 $233,789 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 7/01/2020 $248,962 $184,813 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geoffrey Roberts Director 9/04/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Matthew Bartlett Director 30/12/2020

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.