pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tauranga Community Housing Trust
TCHT
CC23971
9429043107254
Registered

Registration details

5/05/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 13316
Tauranga Central
Tauranga
3141
50 Devonport Road
Tauranga 3110
Tauranga South
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details

07 571 5390


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be the regional community housing provider of choice by: -working with diverse groups and all sectors to improve access to quality, sustainable housing -Providing a housing facilitation service which develops housing solutions for individuals and families -advocating for and implementing new housing models to meet current and emerging community needs

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Housing related services

Accommodation / housing

Community development, Social services, People with disabilities, Housing - provision of housing and housing related services

Other (please state)

(People on low incomes with a serious housing need), Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Charitable trust established in 2003 in response to the lack of suitable, affordable housing options in the Western Bay of Plenty. Since establishing TCHT has broadened client base and geographical area. In 2015 TCHT became a registered community housing provider with the Community Housing Regulatory Authority.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 29/05/2019 $3,334,645 $2,821,235
30/06/2018 29/05/2018 $2,255,007 $1,863,630
30/06/2017 14/06/2017 $2,081,010 $1,195,123
30/06/2016 14/06/2016 $899,792 $807,623
30/06/2015 23/06/2015 $2,458,324 $602,222
30/06/2014 4/06/2014 $369,727 $295,320
30/06/2013 12/06/2013 $872,322 $248,117
30/06/2012 21/06/2012 $233,642 $159,860
30/06/2011 30/05/2011 $299,168 $133,244
30/06/2010 14/07/2010 $172,495 $104,995

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alastair Brownlee Trustee 19/09/2017
Katrina Hulsebosch Trustee 4/05/2017
Dylan Barrett Trustee 30/10/2015
Russell Hunter Trustee 29/05/2014
Josephine Gravit Chairperson 28/04/2011
Catherine Denise Cosgriff Trustee 6/05/2008
Graham James Mallett Trustee 6/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alan Tate Trustee 4/05/2017
Peter Gibson Trustee 30/10/2015
Antony Wellacott Trustee 28/10/2014
Angela Robin Buck Trustee 22/10/2014
Shayne Michael Collins Trustee 20/04/2013
Colleen Marie Wellacott Trustee 18/05/2012
Jan Patrice Glover Deputy Chairperson 20/06/2009
Peter Riley Trustee 20/06/2009
Catherine Clarkson Trustee 28/04/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/04/2016 NOC010
27/11/2015 NOC009
26/03/2015 NOC008
26/11/2014 NOC007
22/10/2014 NOC006
4/06/2014 NOC005
24/05/2012 AR005
30/05/2011 AR004
14/07/2010 AR003
10/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents