pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hutt Valley Sexual Abuse Support and Healing Incorporated
HV SASH
CC10434
9429042671022
Registered

Registration details

12/06/2007
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Hutt Rape Counselling Network Inc. 13/06/2007
Hutt Valley Sexual Abuse Support and Healing Incorporated 16/11/2017

Address for service

PO Box 45034
Waterloo
Lower Hutt
5042
Restricted

Charity's other details

04 566 5517
Facebook icon image
Hutt Valley Sexual Abuse Support & Healing


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide free Support and Counselling to people affected by sexual abuse, rape, and sexual harm. To educate and provide information to individuals, community groups and other organisations. To uphold the articles of Te Tiriti o Waitangi.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The service is governed by a Board comprising a minimum of six individuals and not more than ten elected members according to the rules. Daily operations are carried out by an Operations Manager, Business Administrator, Crisis Support Coordinator and Business Hours Crisis Support worker. The service has ACC counsellors, a family/whanau counsellor, psychologists, and a social worker who are contractors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $1,371,511 $889,733
30/09/2021 13/09/2021 $1,494,396 $991,071
30/09/2020 23/09/2020 $910,210 $791,305
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $788,689 $764,339
30/09/2018 23/09/2018 $741,654 $786,978
30/09/2017 21/09/2017 $688,165 $730,097
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
30/09/2015 18/11/2015 $287,219 $299,714
30/09/2014 22/10/2014 $246,240 $241,479

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adrian Ross Board Member 13/09/2022
Tania Yorwath Board Member 13/09/2022
Sarah Hutchings Board Member 16/02/2021
Karla Davidson-Brown Chairperson 18/09/2018
Lesley Cornish Secretary 18/09/2018
Vicki Pickering Board Member 2/02/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Neil Holden Board Member 13/09/2022
Susan Rau Board Member 13/09/2022
Ian Sheilds Board Member 14/09/2021
Anthony Tebbutt Board Member 15/09/2020
Johanne Greally Board Member 15/09/2020
Lesley Daly Board Member 17/09/2019
Justine Storey Board Member 22/05/2018
Tanya Ngareta Coombe Secretary 13/12/2015
Alistair Oliphant Beckett Board Member 23/09/2015
Linda Beckett Board member 23/09/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/01/2023 NOC026
20/07/2022 NOC024
1/07/2021 NOC022
24/11/2017 NOC018
5/09/2013 NOC009
5/09/2013 NOC008
6/05/2013 NOC007
12/10/2012 AR006
15/09/2011 AR005
10/06/2011 NOC006

Charity Documents