pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


LUG South
CC54116
9429043309245
Registered

Registration details

31/01/2017
March 31

Address for service

49 Roslyn Road
RD 6
Roslyn Bush
Invercargill
9876

Charity's other details

027 499 5103
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/groups/967660033272823/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to share the Trustee's passion for Lego with the general public for the benefit, directly or indirectly, of any child who is sick, infirm, disabled or disadvantaged and the families thereof within the Southland/Otago region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Health

Other charities

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The structure of the Trust is three (3) Board members, being a Chairman, a Secretary and a Treasurer, who are also the Trustee's. The Trust also has members who help the Trust Board by exhibiting their Lego and generally helping out at the Trust's various Lego exhibitions. Membership is free.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 27/09/2023 $23,609 $20,293
30/09/2022 30/08/2022 $17,003 $15,021
30/09/2021 29/08/2021 $9,785 $6,454
30/09/2020 14/09/2020 $26,730 $20,313
30/09/2019 28/09/2019 $19,935 $21,749
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $15,383 $12,211
30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $0 $1,601

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hamish Todd Lindsay Trustee 26/07/2020
Christopher Bruce Knight Chairman 21/09/2018
Gavin Evans Secretary/Treasurer 7/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher Dawson Chairman 26/07/2020
Paul Cusack Treasurer 21/09/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/08/2020 NOC008
20/02/2019 NOC006
27/04/2017 NOC002
4/02/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents