Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Eden Park Trust
CC32802
9429047124417
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
October 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Eden Park Trust Board 30/06/2008
Eden Park Trust 21/09/2009

Address for service

Private Bag 56906
Dominion Road
Auckland
1446
2-42 Reimers Avenue
Kingsland
Auckland
1446

Charity's other details

09 815 5551
edenparknz
edenparknz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing a multi-purpose stadium for sporting, recreational, musical and cultural events for the benefit of the Auckland region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

The Eden Park Trust is an entity set up to manage and operate the multi-purpose stadium know as Eden Park. Income is derived primarily through Memberships and hire fees. Expenses are incurred through the delivery of events and maintenance of infrastructure.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2023 30/04/2024 31/01/2024 $44,363,000 $65,649,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2022 30/04/2023 1/03/2023 $22,086,000 $25,730,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2021 30/04/2022 1/02/2022 $23,276,000 $24,795,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2020 30/04/2021 22/03/2021 $17,597,000 $21,746,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2019 30/04/2020 30/01/2020 $15,919,000 $22,260,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2018 30/04/2019 7/05/2019 $17,122,000 $24,848,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2017 30/04/2018 22/07/2018 $20,671,000 $25,232,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2016 30/04/2017 3/08/2017 $14,644,000 $21,128,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2015 30/04/2016 22/05/2016 $17,016,000 $22,236,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2014 30/04/2015 27/05/2015 $14,666,000 $22,065,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kereyn Maree Smith Trustee 1/07/2023
William Norman Birnie Trustee 1/07/2023
Brendon James Gibson Trustee 1/04/2021
Andrew John Roberts Trustee 21/07/2020
Nicholas David Albrecht Trustee 21/09/2018
Renata Tuhirangi Geoffrey Blair Trustee 20/09/2018
Victoria Naomi Elizabeth Toon Trustee 20/09/2018
Gregory Mark Edmonds Trustee 1/07/2018
Alan Gourdie Trustee 1/07/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Doug McKay Trustee 30/06/2023
Vicki Salmon Trustee 31/03/2023
Paul Lucas Trustee 31/03/2021
Nicky Duggan Trustee 20/07/2020
Michelle Ann Boag Trustee 19/09/2018
Morris Charles Pita Trustee 19/09/2018
Ken Baguley Trustee 20/07/2018
Rex Francis Smith Trustee 30/06/2018
Grant Carruthers Trustee 1/07/2015
John Anthony Waller Trustee 31/01/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/08/2023 NOC025
1/08/2023 NOC024
21/04/2023 NOC023
31/03/2021 NOC020
28/07/2020 NOC018
21/09/2018 NOC015
21/09/2018 NOC014
28/07/2015 NOC011
27/05/2015 NOC010
12/05/2014 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.