pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


LinkPeople Limited
CC49622
9429030224643
Registered

Registration details

23/05/2013
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Keys Social Housing Limited 23/05/2013
LinkPeople Limited 19/10/2016

Address for service

PO Box 307
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
293 Grey Street
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 857 1200


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wise Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Blueprint NZ Limited
Blueprint Trust Board
Ecopeople Limited
Linkage Limited
LinkPeople Limited
Mental Health Solutions Limited
Pacific Inc. Limited
Pathways Health Limited
Pathways Trust Board
Wise Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides Social housing

Accommodation / housing

Social services, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(Vulnerable people), People with disabilities


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Penelope Hulst Director 10/10/2019
Hine Martin Director 3/06/2013
Paul Raymond Bennett Director 3/06/2013
Bruce Sheridan director 16/05/2013
Julie Nelson Director 16/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jacqueline Graham Director 27/11/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/06/2020 NOC004
13/03/2019 NOC003
22/12/2016 NOC002
19/12/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents