Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hui E! Community Aotearoa
CC51043
9429043285723
Registered

Registration details

23/10/2014
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 25333
Featherston Street
Wellington
6146

Charity's other details

+642102229325
https://www.facebook.com/huie.org.nz/
https://www.linkedin.com/company/hui-e-community-aotearoa/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We weave collective voices and drive equitable systems change so that communities, hapū and iwi can do what they do best. We champion and tautoko the mahi of thousands of community groups, hapū and iwi across Aotearoa New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Community Sector), Education / training / research, Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Community Sector NGOs), Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Entity Structure

Hui E! Community Aotearoa is supported by two houses: Tangata Whenua and Tangata Tiriti. This includes equal membership on a 50:50 basis and shared leadership between the Tangata Whenua and Tangata Tiriti houses via Co-Chair.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/11/2023 $545,360 $554,450 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 16/12/2022 $397,841 $366,723 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 5/11/2021 $207,876 $196,622 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 20/11/2020 $182,058 $146,128 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 19/12/2019 $194,606 $206,650 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 26/10/2018 $194,986 $211,088 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 30/01/2018 $172,607 $233,340 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 12/12/2016 $256,886 $289,107 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 26/11/2015 $18,430 $106,516 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rula Talahma Trustee 8/11/2023
Virginia Denny Trustee 8/12/2022
Cheyenne Heke Trustee 14/10/2022
Jewelz Petley Trustee 14/10/2022
Soifua Pearson Trustee 14/10/2022
William Karaitiana Trustee 14/10/2022
Andrea Jerry Ryan Trustee 25/10/2021
Sarah Morris Trustee 25/10/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Prabha Ravi Trustee 31/10/2023
Khoa Nguyen Trustee 4/11/2022
Dorte Wray Trustee 14/10/2022
Pania Tui Coote Trustee 14/10/2022
Tanya White Trustee 30/08/2022
Iris Margaret Pahau Trustee 23/06/2022
Annette Papuni-Mclellan Trustee 21/06/2022
Sarah Doherty Trustee 20/05/2022
Charlie Moore Trustee 25/10/2021
Pania Tui Coote Co-Chair 25/10/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/12/2023 NOC029
16/12/2022 NOC025
14/12/2022 NOC024
28/10/2022 NOC022
28/10/2022 NOC021
12/09/2022 NOC020
13/07/2022 NOC019
29/06/2022 NOC018
22/06/2022 NOC017
3/06/2022 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.