Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Student Job Search Aotearoa Incorporated
Student Job Search
CC37101
9429042839255
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 25010
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
Level 8, Grand Annexe
84 Boulcott Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0800 757 562


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

SJS was established to help minimise student poverty and improve students' long term employment prospects.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Employment

Social services

Other (please state)

(Tertiary Students), General public

Entity Structure

SJS is a member organisation which is 100% owned by Students' Associations throughout NZ, and is governed by a Board comprising of 6 elected members (two year term) plus 2 National Student Representatives (one year term) and a minimum of 2 and maximum of 3 appointed Board members (2-3 year term).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

Balance Date of 30 June – This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 6/12/2023 $4,847,892 $4,551,651 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 6/12/2022 $4,476,807 $4,367,897 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 30/11/2021 $3,946,903 $4,019,773 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 18/12/2020 $3,496,118 $3,526,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 6/11/2019 $3,605,478 $3,608,130 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 26/11/2018 $3,691,816 $3,560,484 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 24/11/2017 $3,677,079 $3,784,115 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/11/2016 $3,706,728 $4,179,413 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $3,753,808 $3,871,937 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 30/10/2014 $3,702,829 $3,628,920 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Keith Nicholas Grafas Interim CEO 6/11/2023
Craig Mildenhall Board Member 15/09/2023
Ian Simpson Board Member 15/09/2023
Liam McLeavey Board Member 1/05/2023
Lucy Hickman Chair 1/05/2023
Parearau Graham Board Member 1/05/2023
James Grafas Board Member 1/04/2022
Danyon William Thomas Board Member 17/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Suzanne Boyd Cheif Executive Officer 6/11/2023
James Heath Deputy Chair 30/04/2023
Candra Lee Pullon Deputy Chair 31/12/2022
Michael Alexander James Leach Chief Executive 14/02/2020
William Matthew Chair 6/09/2019
Kahlia Fryer Chair 16/11/2018
Timothy Allen Chief Executive 1/11/2018
Scott Tambisari Deputy Chair 17/11/2017
Catherine Nelson Chief Executive 28/10/2016
Catherine Bell Chair 6/11/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/11/2023 NOC033
17/07/2023 NOC032
12/07/2023 NOC031
30/01/2023 NOC030
14/12/2021 NOC028
6/11/2019 NOC025
2/10/2019 NOC023
30/07/2019 NOC022
19/07/2019 NOC021
21/11/2016 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.