pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Netsafe Incorporated
Netsafe
CC24058
9429042994879
Registered

Registration details

7/05/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Internet Safety Group Incorporated 8/05/2008
Netsafe Incorporated 5/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 124
Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1140
Level 2 The General Building
29-33 Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

0508638732


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Internet Safety Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Hector's World Limited
Netsafe Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Supporting people in Aotearoa to create safe and positive online spaces

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Incorporate society of members

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2022 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2017 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2016 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $859,000 $958,721
30/09/2014 15/10/2014 $1,098,038 $981,772

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brent Carey Chief Executive Officer 2/05/2022
Miriam Walker Board member 14/12/2021
Stephen James Honiss Board member 16/02/2021
Anita Killeen Board Member 8/12/2020
Natalia D'Souza Board Member 10/12/2019
Colin James Board Member 12/02/2015
Claire Amos Board Member 1/02/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jonathan James Duffy Board Member 14/12/2021
Martin Cocker Executive Director 14/12/2021
Andrew Cowie Board Member 15/12/2020
Richard John Simon Shera Chairman 8/12/2020
Miriam Walker Board Member 1/02/2020
John Robert Martin Board Member 31/10/2016
Michael David Lett Treasurer 21/01/2016
Katrine Evans Board member 31/03/2015
Stephen James Honiss Board Member 9/10/2014
Sarah Thomson Office Manager 21/03/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/09/2022 NOC041
25/08/2022 NOC039
22/02/2022 NOC038
24/12/2021 NOC037
15/02/2021 NOC034
17/11/2020 NOC033
4/12/2019 NOC032
7/05/2018 NOC029
17/01/2018 NOC028
17/01/2018 NOC027

Charity Documents