Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Fire And Destiny Centre
CC11272
9429043118892
Registered

Registration details

4/10/2007
March 31

Address for service

18 Queen Street
Mosgiel
9024

Charity's other details

(03) 4898567


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Entity's Purpose and Mission: To support the proclamation of the Gospel and the discipleship of all people in Biblical principles and practices. To be a voice in the community and in the nation. To promote the welfare and well being of people. To foster education for all ages. The trust fulfils the following criteria: It is for the benefit of the Christian religion. It ensures that religious faith is passed on to others. It has a belief in a supernatural being and an acceptance of conduct in order to give effect to that belief. It advances religion by passing faith on to others by spreading its message and taking positive steps to sustain and increase religious belief. Fire and Destiny Centre advances religion by: Celebrating religious services in public. Supplying religious literature. Providing religious education through Sunday School, Youth Group and conducting religious conferences.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Fire and Destiny Centre Trust includes Celebration Church, Mosgiel. Fire and Destiny Centre Trust has a board of Trustees. As per the trust deed the positions of Chairperson, Vice Chairperson, Treasurer and Secretary are decided by the board annually. Celebration Church is led by a pastoral team. The pastoral team is comprised of pastors and other group leaders. Most of our activities and administration are done by volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/09/2023 $75,491 $67,845 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/09/2022 $76,683 $69,948 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/09/2021 $64,200 $63,813 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/09/2020 $67,491 $65,550 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 7/09/2019 $67,548 $65,575 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 23/09/2018 $49,480 $60,590 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 13/09/2017 $47,890 $59,036 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 8/08/2016 $60,972 $66,393 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 1/07/2015 $61,745 $61,878 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 26/09/2014 $65,097 $69,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrea Heather Scott Trustee 15/05/2011
Nathan John Shaw chairperson 5/09/2007
Susanne Elizabeth Nesbit Vice-Chairperson 5/09/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
William Mark Bedford Trustee 3/12/2010
Graham Service Moore trustee 1/01/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/04/2019 NOC012
9/04/2018 NOC010
12/05/2011 NOC004
2/01/2011 NOC003
23/01/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.