Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ohotu 1C1 Trust is a marae on Māori Reservation Land. The Māori Reservation Regulations 1994 require that where a reservation is a marae the trustees of the reservation shall draw up, in agreement with the beneficiaries of the marae, a charter for the reservation. A copy of the Ohotu 1C1 Trust Charter is published below. This Charter is not a part of the marae's formal rules as required under s17(1)(c) of the Charities Act 2005.

Ohotu 1C1 Matahiwi Marae Trustees
CC51337
N/A
Registered

Registration details

19/07/2012
March 31

Address for service

4 Kea Place
Whanganui East
Whanganui
4500

Charity's other details

+64 021 1325689


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Asset holder on behalf of the beneficiaries of Ohotu 1C1 Block, Matahiwi Marae for their common use

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Marae ,Community, focal point for beneficiaries, umbrella hapu/communal initiatives ,inclusive of wider beneficiaries

Marae on reservation land

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(Beneficiaries of Ohotu 1C1, whanau, hapu community)

Entity Structure

Trustees, Chairman, Secretary, Treasurer, committee of management

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The Trust has provided financial statements for the financial years ending 31 March 2012, 31 March 2013 and 31 March 2014. As it was backdated in 2015 to 19 July 2012, the Trust does not have to provide annual returns for the period between their application and registration.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/09/2024 $470,987 $28,931 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 3/12/2023 $13,594 $10,752 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 10/12/2022 22/12/2022 $5,822 $10,709 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 24/08/2022 $26,371 $14,953 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/11/2020 $2,041 $9,674 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 16/11/2020 $13,380 $7,031 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 14/12/2018 18/10/2019 $153,266 $136,983 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $8,512 $14,918 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 6/12/2016 $13,549 $23,187 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Delcina Makareta Teresa Goff Trustee 17/09/2024
Nathan Rukuwa Ranginui Trustee 17/09/2024
Fabian Lloyd Ponga Trustee 7/02/2024
Lee Ramari Hall Trustee 7/02/2024
Te Rangi Peneta Goff Trustee 7/02/2024
Alistair Te Rangituatea Goff Trustee 10/06/2015
Dolores Styles Trustee 12/07/2011
Jenny Tamakehu Treasurer 12/07/2011
Neil Ranginui Chairperson 12/07/2011
Penelope Wiari Secretary 12/07/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gwen Mate Thompson Trustee 18/10/2019
Daryn Te Uamairangi Trustee 21/08/2019
Haimona Rzoska Trustee/Chairman 29/09/2016
Marilyn Tamakehu Trustee 10/06/2015
Ramari Ranginui Trustee 10/06/2015
Lee Hall Trustee 2/05/2015
Bernadette Ranginui Trustee 1/10/2014
Lester Goff Trustee 1/10/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/09/2019 NOC010
24/05/2018 NOC008
27/04/2018 NOC006
12/03/2016 NOC003
22/12/2015 NOC002
2/12/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.